Brannagan Properties Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035254447) was incorporated on 02 Aug 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 20 Jul 2018. Brannagan Properties Limited used more names, namely: Brannagan Print Limited from 02 Aug 2004 to 16 Jul 2015. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Andersen, Svend Laan (an individual) located at Rd 6, Warkworth postcode 0986. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 20 Jul 2018 |
Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 13 Sep 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Svend Laan Andersen
Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 02 Aug 2004 - current |
Susan Beryl Andersen
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 05 Sep 2018
Grafton, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 01 Sep 2011 |
Director | 02 Aug 2004 - 11 Nov 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1141 | Registered | 25 Feb 2015 - 20 Jul 2018 |
Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1141 | Physical | 25 Feb 2015 - 13 Sep 2018 |
Suite 9b, 2 St Martins Lane, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2014 - 25 Feb 2015 |
1/15 Norman Spencer Drive, Manukau City | Physical | 06 Nov 2007 - 01 Oct 2014 |
1/15a Norman Spencer Drive, Manukau City | Registered | 29 Sep 2006 - 01 Oct 2014 |
5 Brett Avenue, Papatoetoe | Physical | 02 Aug 2004 - 06 Nov 2007 |
5 Brett Avenue, Papatoetoe | Registered | 02 Aug 2004 - 29 Sep 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Andersen, Svend Laan Individual |
Rd 6 Warkworth 0986 |
02 Aug 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Andersen, Susan Beryl Individual |
Grafton Auckland 1010 |
02 Aug 2004 - 07 Jul 2023 |
Stone Dental Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
|
Halfway Down Dominion Rd Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
|
Flyingmedicine.com Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
|
Andrew Lienert Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
|
Fiona Lienert Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
|
Bings Motel Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |