Landlords Property Manager Limited (NZBN 9429046284686) was registered on 07 Aug 2017. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 4A Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1042 (type: service, registered). 4A Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 10 Aug 2020. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Bradley, Michael (a director) located at Mount Roskill, Auckland postcode 1041. "Marketing consultancy service" (business classification M696252) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Landlords Property Manager Limited. Our data was last updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4a Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1062 | Physical & service | 15 Jul 2020 |
4a Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1062 | Registered | 10 Aug 2020 |
4a Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1042 | Service & registered | 13 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Bradley
Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 05 Jul 2023
Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 07 Jul 2020
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 07 Aug 2017 |
Director | 07 Aug 2017 - current |
Kimberly Miller
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 07 Aug 2017 |
Director | 07 Aug 2017 - 20 Aug 2017 |
4a Rustic Avenue, , Mt Roskill , Auckland , 1061 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4a Rustic Ave, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1062 | Registered | 15 Jul 2020 - 10 Aug 2020 |
Flat 1, 150 Arthur Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical | 07 May 2018 - 15 Jul 2020 |
Flat 1, 150 Arthur Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered | 07 Aug 2017 - 07 May 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bradley, Michael Director |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
07 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Kimberly Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
07 Aug 2017 - 27 Nov 2017 |
Kimberly Miller Director |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
07 Aug 2017 - 27 Nov 2017 |
Helicopter Labour Services Limited 142f Arthur Street |
|
Cham Tailor Co. Limited Shop 601, 151 Arthur Street |
|
Goodness Center Limited Suite 624, 151 Arthur Street |
|
United Jewellers Limited Suite 5a, 151 Arthur Street |
|
Sequeiros Residences Trustees Limited Unit 201/287 Onehunga Mall |
|
Everbest Trading Limited 4/267 Onehunga Mall |
Creo Marketing Limited 54g Alfred Street |
Montgomery Marketing Limited 25a Heretaunga Avenue |
Owned & Earned Limited 54a Symonds Street |
Aqute (nz) Limited 39 Golf Road |
Altena Trustees Limited 39 Golf Road |
Sound And Fury Limited 1/1 Aliford Avenue |