Almosta Farm Limited (NZBN 9429046252159) was incorporated on 20 Jul 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Kirkwood Street, Cambridge, 3434 (type: registered, physical). 2 Kirkwood Street, Cambridge, Cambridge had been their physical address, until 22 Jul 2021. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 80 shares (80% of shares), namely:
Cordiner, Ross Andrew (a director) located at Rd 5, Karamu postcode 3285. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (exactly 20 shares); it includes
Cordiner, Leigh-Anne Bronwyn (an individual) - located at Rd 5, Karamu. "Beef cattle farming" (ANZSIC A014220) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Almosta Farm Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Kirkwood Street, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered & physical & service | 22 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ross Andrew Cordiner
Rd 5, Karamu, 3285
Address used since 24 Jul 2018
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 20 Jul 2017 |
Director | 20 Jul 2017 - current |
Leigh-anne Bronwyn Cordiner
Rd 5, Karamu, 3285
Address used since 24 Jul 2018
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 20 Jul 2017 |
Director | 20 Jul 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Kirkwood Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Physical & registered | 21 Jul 2021 - 22 Jul 2021 |
2 Kirkwood Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered & physical | 06 Aug 2020 - 21 Jul 2021 |
18 Lake Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered & physical | 20 Jul 2017 - 06 Aug 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cordiner, Ross Andrew Director |
Rd 5 Karamu 3285 |
20 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cordiner, Leigh-anne Bronwyn Individual |
Rd 5 Karamu 3285 |
28 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cordiner, Leigh-anne Director |
Rd 9 Hamilton 3289 |
20 Jul 2017 - 28 Aug 2017 |
Mahant Krupa Limited 18 Lake Street |
|
Spoken Cycles Limited 48 Empire Street |
|
The Float Room Limited 48 Empire Street |
|
New Zealand Thoroughbred Breeders Association Incorporated 47 Alpha Street |
|
The Cambridge Chamber Of Commerce Incorporated Level One |
|
T42 Investments Limited 47 Alpha Street |
Rangea Farm Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
Karapiro Berry Box Limited 459 Maungatautari Road |
Lalich Enterprises Limited 515 Kaipaki Road |
Matau North Ventures Limited 8 Geoffrey Place |
Chattertons Holdings Limited 195 Mahoe Street |
Earthbrooke Views Limited 242 Bank Street |