Chevalier Wholesale Produce Limited (issued a business number of 9429040573564) was registered on 18 Aug 1971. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, service). Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their registered address, until 13 Feb 2024. Chevalier Wholesale Produce Limited used other names, namely: Pt Chevalier Fruit Plaza Limited from 20 Dec 1984 to 15 Dec 1995, Kanji Enterprises Limited (18 Aug 1971 to 20 Dec 1984). 600000 shares are allocated to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 8343 shares (1.39% of shares), namely:
Chhita, Jigisha Rangildas (an individual) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 1.39% of all shares (exactly 8342 shares); it includes
Chhita, Pushpa (an individual) - located at Hillsborough, Auckland,
Chhita, Pushpa (an individual) - located at Hillsborough, Auckland. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (283315 shares, 47.22%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
R&P Chhita Trustee Company Limited, located at 188 Quay Street, Auckland (an entity),
Bsa Trustee Company Limited, located at Auckland Central, Auckland (an entity),
Chhita, Chetan Rangildas, located at Mount Eden, Auckland (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical | 04 Aug 2003 |
Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & service | 13 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Chetan Rangildas Chhita
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 09 Feb 2022
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 24 Feb 2016
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 27 Feb 2019 |
Director | 18 Feb 2004 - current |
Pushpa Chhita
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 27 Feb 2019
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 24 Feb 2016 |
Director | 18 Feb 2004 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Rangildas Chhita
Lynfield, Auckland,
Address used since 28 Mar 1986 |
Director | 28 Mar 1986 - 18 Feb 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Registered & service | 04 Aug 2003 - 13 Feb 2024 |
Level 2, Bdo House, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical | 14 Mar 2003 - 04 Aug 2003 |
Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 166 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical | 13 Jul 1998 - 13 Jul 1998 |
34 Fremlin Place, Avondale | Physical | 13 Jul 1998 - 14 Mar 2003 |
C/- B D O Hogg Young Cathie, 166 Harris Road, East Tamaki | Registered | 10 Aug 1997 - 04 Aug 2003 |
Hogg Young Cathie/bdg, Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street, Auckland | Registered | 28 Jul 1996 - 10 Aug 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chhita, Jigisha Rangildas Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
09 Feb 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chhita, Pushpa Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
18 Aug 1971 - current |
Chhita, Pushpa Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
01 Jul 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
R&p Chhita Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051415907 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
188 Quay Street Auckland 1010 |
21 Sep 2023 - current |
Bsa Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033414416 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
28 Apr 2011 - current |
Chhita, Chetan Rangildas Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
09 Feb 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chhita, Chetan Rangildas Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
09 Feb 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chhita, Puspha Individual |
Lynfield , (with Chetan Chhita & Philip H Blank) |
18 Aug 1971 - 28 Apr 2011 |
Chhita, Rangildas Individual |
(with Philip H Blank & Rushpa Chhita) |
18 Aug 1971 - 09 Feb 2005 |
Chhita, Chetan Rangildas Individual |
(with Philip H Blank And Pushpa Chhita) |
01 Jul 2005 - 28 Apr 2011 |
Blank, Philip Harry Individual |
Lynfield , (with Chetan Chhita & Pushpa Chhita) |
18 Aug 1971 - 28 Apr 2011 |
Ideal Motorgroup Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Review Properties Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Virtualise It Limited Unit 7, Level 1, 15 Accent Drive |
|
Euro Holdings Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Sika Ip Limited Level 2, Bdo House, 116 Harris Road |
|
Bsm Group Offices Limited Level 1, 52 Highbrook Drive |