Nzt Investments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038405891) was launched on 19 Dec 1995. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8011 (type: office, delivery). 92 Russley Road, Russley, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 25 Sep 2017. Nzt Investments Limited used more aliases, namely: Nz Toner Cartridge Company Limited from 19 Dec 1995 to 30 Apr 2018. 20000 shares are allotted to 8 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 6666 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Polychem Limited (an entity) located at 181 High Street, Christchurch postcode 8011. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 33.34 per cent of all shares (6667 shares); it includes
Oxford Street Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch,
Walker Davey Trustee Services (2006) Limited (an entity) - located at 181 High Street, Christchurch,
Kennett, Graham (an individual) - located at Springbank, Rangiora. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (6667 shares, 33.34%) belongs to 4 entities, namely:
Rawlings, Philip John, located at Casebrook, Christchurch 8051 (an individual),
Tutty, Geoffrey Colin, located at Hornby, Christchurch (an individual),
Tutty, Doris Adelaide, located at Christchurch (an individual). Our database was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
92 Russley Road, Russley, Christchurch, 8042 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 04 Jul 2011 |
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Shareregister & other (Address For Share Register) | 15 Sep 2017 |
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered & service | 25 Sep 2017 |
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Office & delivery | 09 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Graham Kennett
Rd 1, Rangiora, 7471
Address used since 26 Mar 2010 |
Director | 19 Dec 1995 - current |
John Melville Abbot
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 26 Mar 2018 |
Director | 26 Mar 2018 - current |
Geoffrey Colin Tutty
Hornby, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 30 May 2002 |
Director | 30 May 2002 - 20 Nov 2017 |
Rory Daniel Kennett
North New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 26 Mar 2010 |
Director | 30 May 2002 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Laurence Stephenson
Christchurch,
Address used since 30 May 2002 |
Director | 30 May 2002 - 01 Apr 2007 |
Patricia June Kennett
Christchurch,
Address used since 19 Dec 1995 |
Director | 19 Dec 1995 - 06 Jan 1997 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Office & delivery | 09 Mar 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
92 Russley Road, Russley, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered | 21 Apr 2011 - 25 Sep 2017 |
Walker Davey Ltd, 3rd Floor, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2005 - 21 Apr 2011 |
Spicer House, 3rd Floor, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 10 Apr 2005 - 11 Apr 2005 |
C/- Walker Davey & Ltd, 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered | 14 Apr 2001 - 11 Apr 2005 |
C/- Walker Davey & Ltd, 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 14 Apr 2001 - 14 Apr 2001 |
C/- Walker Davey Ltd, 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 14 Apr 2001 - 10 Apr 2005 |
C/- Walker Davey & Co, 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 14 Apr 2001 |
C/- Walker Davey & Co, 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 19 Dec 1995 - 14 Apr 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Polychem Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031012003 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
181 High Street Christchurch 8011 |
27 Jul 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oxford Street Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035941750 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
27 Jul 2011 - current |
Walker Davey Trustee Services (2006) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034381847 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
181 High Street Christchurch 8144 |
27 Jul 2011 - current |
Kennett, Graham Individual |
Springbank Rangiora |
19 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rawlings, Philip John Individual |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 |
19 Dec 1995 - current |
Tutty, Geoffrey Colin Individual |
Hornby Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - current |
Tutty, Doris Adelaide Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - current |
Earle, Peter Gerald Individual |
Broadfield, R D Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kennett, Rory Daniel Individual |
Christchurch (as Trustee Of Rory Kennett Familytrust) |
19 Dec 1995 - 23 Dec 2016 |
Stephenson, Mary Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Stephenson, Laurence Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Kennett, Nathan James Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - 04 Apr 2008 |
Stephenson, David G C Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Dec 1995 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Montreal 248 Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Kaikoura Music Festival Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Cai Residential Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
M & S Bradley Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
880 Main North Road Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Win Sor 45 Limited Level 2, Building One |