Webcraft Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033558349) was incorporated on 07 Mar 2007. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 112A Colwill Road, Massey, Auckland, 0614 (type: office, postal). 1229 Coatesville-Riverhead Highway, Kumeu, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 20 May 2015. Webcraft Limited used other aliases, namely: Webcraft Limited from 07 Mar 2007 to 21 Mar 2012. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Knight, Nilam (an individual) located at Massey, Auckland postcode 0614,
Cornwall Trustees 51 Limited (an entity) located at Newmarket, Auckland postcode 1023,
Knight, David Wentworth (an individual) located at Massey, Auckland postcode 0614. "Internet web site design service" (ANZSIC M700040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Webcraft Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
112a Colwill Road, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Office | unknown |
112a Colwill Road, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Physical & registered & service | 20 May 2015 |
112a Colwill Road, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Postal & delivery | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Wentworth Knight
Massey, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 07 Apr 2015 |
Director | 07 Apr 2015 - current |
David Howard Organ
Kumeu, 0892
Address used since 23 Jun 2008 |
Director | 23 Jun 2008 - 13 May 2015 |
Melissa Organ
Kumeu, Auckland, 0892
Address used since 29 Apr 2008 |
Director | 07 Mar 2007 - 28 May 2012 |
112a Colwill Road , Massey , Auckland , 0614 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1229 Coatesville-riverhead Highway, Kumeu, Auckland | Physical & registered | 06 May 2008 - 20 May 2015 |
36 Western Rd, Laingholm, Auckland | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2007 - 06 May 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Knight, Nilam Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
07 Apr 2015 - current |
Cornwall Trustees 51 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031977081 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
07 Apr 2015 - current |
Knight, David Wentworth Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
07 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Organ, David Howard Individual |
Kumeu |
23 Jun 2008 - 07 Apr 2015 |
Lockie, Karana Individual |
Rd 2 Kumeu 0892 |
07 Jan 2014 - 07 Apr 2015 |
Organ, Melissa Individual |
Kumeu Auckland |
07 Mar 2007 - 28 May 2012 |
Nzbuy365 Limited 108c Colwill Road |
|
Lifestyle Trust Holdings Limited 108d Colwill Road |
|
Lifestyle Trust Limited 108 D Colwill Road |
|
Zawadi Enterprises Limited 122a Colwill Road |
|
Elite Auto Air & Electrical Limited 127a Colwill Rd |
|
I.t. Tailor Limited 8 Kintara Drive |
Widegrid Limited 97 Colwill Road |
Iconnect Limited 6 Queen Natalie Place |
Graphiques 2007 Limited 2b Neil Avenue |
Evergreen Elements Limited 17 Enderby Drive |
Two Sparrows Limited 3 Hueglow Rise |
Design Wizards Limited 4 Provence Esplanade |