Tarbert Trustees (2008) Limited (issued a business number of 9429033391113) was registered on 16 May 2007. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra, 9320 (type: registered, service). C/-Ibbotson Cooney Limited, Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra had been their registered address, until 26 Jun 2012. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Icl Trustee Company (Holdings) Limited (an entity) located at Alexandra, Alexandra postcode 9320. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra, 9320 | Registered & physical & service | 26 Jun 2012 |
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra, 9320 | Registered & service | 15 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Campbell Robert Dykes
Rd 3, Alexandra, 9393
Address used since 12 Oct 2009 |
Director | 16 May 2007 - current |
George Richard Collier
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 16 Oct 2015 |
Director | 16 May 2007 - current |
Simon Kirk Wearing
Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391
Address used since 27 Jan 2022
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 16 Oct 2015 |
Director | 23 May 2008 - current |
Janette Susan Matheson
Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391
Address used since 01 Nov 2012 |
Director | 23 May 2008 - current |
Glen Alan Chisholm
Clyde, Clyde, 9330
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Georgina Kathrine Mclean
Rd 3, Alexandra, 9393
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Georgina Kathrne Mclean
Rd 3, Alexandra, 9393
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Philip Blair Pedofsky
Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391
Address used since 01 Nov 2012 |
Director | 23 May 2008 - 18 Sep 2023 |
William Thomas Cooney
Alexandra,
Address used since 16 May 2007 |
Director | 16 May 2007 - 31 Jul 2015 |
Russell Warren Ibbotson
Alexandra,
Address used since 16 May 2007 |
Director | 16 May 2007 - 31 May 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-ibbotson Cooney Limited, Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra | Registered & physical | 16 May 2007 - 26 Jun 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Icl Trustee Company (holdings) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051607401 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
26 Oct 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Icl Chartered Accountants Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037362805 Company Number: 1015794 Entity |
69 Tarbert Street Alexandra 9320 |
16 May 2007 - 26 Oct 2023 |
The Gorge Pastoral Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |
|
Cornaig Holdings Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |
|
Precision Works (2013) Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |
|
Cornaig Farms Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |
|
Blackstone Hill Mining Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |
|
Tarbert Trustees (2013) Limited Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street |