Dunlop Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429032908145) was incorporated on 15 Feb 2008. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Po Box 3367, Hawkes Bay Mail Centre, Napier, 4132 (type: postal, delivery). Level 3, 6 Albion Street, Napier had been their physical address, up until 01 May 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Robinson, Blair (an individual) located at Napier,
Tremain, Jan Gwendolen (an individual) located at Taradale, Napier postcode 4183,
Tremain, Mark Duncan (an individual) located at Taradale, Napier postcode 4183. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Waites, Anthony Dean (an individual) - located at Tuki Tuki, Havelock North,
Field, Jocelyn Elizabeth (an individual) - located at Tuki Tuki, Havelock North. Our database was updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
116 Vautier Street, Napier | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 15 Feb 2008 |
1dunlop Road, Onekawa, Napier, Hawke's Bay, 4110 | Physical & registered & service | 01 May 2018 |
Po Box 3367, Hawkes Bay Mail Centre, Napier, 4132 | Postal | 04 May 2019 |
Unit 103, 6 Albion Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Delivery | 04 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Dean Waites
Rd 12, Havelock North, 4294
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 15 Feb 2008 - current |
Mark Duncan Tremain
Taradale, Napier, 4183
Address used since 01 Apr 2015 |
Director | 15 Feb 2008 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Unit 103, 6 Albion Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Delivery | 04 May 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 6 Albion Street, Napier, 4110 | Physical & registered | 20 Apr 2018 - 01 May 2018 |
1dunlop Road, Onekawa, Napier, Hawkes Bay, 4110 | Registered | 20 Mar 2018 - 20 Apr 2018 |
1dunlop Road, Onekawa, Napier, Hawkes Bay, 4110 | Registered | 27 Mar 2014 - 20 Mar 2018 |
116 Vautier Street, Napier | Registered | 15 Feb 2008 - 27 Mar 2014 |
116 Vautier Street, Napier | Physical | 15 Feb 2008 - 20 Apr 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robinson, Blair Individual |
Napier |
15 Feb 2008 - current |
Tremain, Jan Gwendolen Individual |
Taradale Napier 4183 |
15 Feb 2008 - current |
Tremain, Mark Duncan Individual |
Taradale Napier 4183 |
15 Feb 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waites, Anthony Dean Individual |
Tuki Tuki Havelock North 4294 |
15 Feb 2008 - current |
Field, Jocelyn Elizabeth Individual |
Tuki Tuki Havelock North 4294 |
15 Feb 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hislop, Susan Dorothy Individual |
Hastings |
15 Feb 2008 - 28 Feb 2011 |
Almak Security Limited 19 Carnegie Road |
|
East Coast Soundz And Auto Electrix Limited 2 Dunlop Road |
|
Onekawa Metal Recyclers Limited 9 Dunlop Road |
|
Zero Light Photography Limited 16 Dunlop Road |
|
Eclypse Solutions 4 Schools Limited 6a Holden Street |
|
Hinemanu Limited Suite 5, 46 Holden Street |