Pswm Stalker Trustee Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032664751) was registered on 04 Jul 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9348 (type: registered, physical). Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown had been their physical address, until 20 Feb 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Brent, Stephen Ross (an individual) located at Lower Shotover, Queenstown postcode 9304. Businesscheck's data was updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9348 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephen Ross Brent
Lower Shotover, Queenstown, 9304
Address used since 09 Feb 2018
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 10 Feb 2010 |
Director | 04 Jul 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9348 | Physical & registered | 20 Feb 2015 - 20 Feb 2019 |
C/- Cavell Leitch, Level 2, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9348 | Registered & physical | 19 Feb 2013 - 20 Feb 2015 |
C/-anderson Lloyd, Level 2, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown | Physical & registered | 17 Feb 2010 - 19 Feb 2013 |
C/-brent Law, Level 1, 24 Camp Street, Queenstown 9348 | Physical & registered | 04 Jul 2008 - 17 Feb 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brent, Stephen Ross Individual |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 |
04 Jul 2008 - current |
Warner NZ Investments Lp Cavell Leitch |
|
Good Group Limited Level 3 Mountaineer Building |
|
Resort Property Trust Limited 32 Rees St |
|
Blackstar Properties Limited 32 Rees Street |
|
Sfc Properties Limited Level 3 Mountaineer Building |
|
Goodbars.co.nz Limited Level 3 Mountaineer Building |