Weranui Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429030683471) was incorporated on 08 May 2012. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 17, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, until 18 Dec 2023. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Mccool, Samuel Finnius (an individual) located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. "Mixed livestock farming nec" (ANZSIC A019975) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Weranui Holdings Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 28 Mar 2018 |
Level 8, 139 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 18 Dec 2023 |
Level 17, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 07 Jun 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Debra Marie Mccool
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 27 Mar 2018
Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 08 May 2012 |
Director | 08 May 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 28 Mar 2018 - 18 Dec 2023 |
46j Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 17 Dec 2014 - 28 Mar 2018 |
46j Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 16 Dec 2014 - 28 Mar 2018 |
24-26 Pollen Street, Ponosnby, Auckland, 1021 | Physical | 19 Mar 2013 - 17 Dec 2014 |
24-26 Pollen Street, Ponosnby, Auckland, 1021 | Registered | 19 Mar 2013 - 16 Dec 2014 |
Level 13, 175 Queen Street, Auckland Central, 1010 | Physical & registered | 08 May 2012 - 19 Mar 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccool, Samuel Finnius Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
08 May 2012 - current |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Radon Limited Level 4, 4 Graham Street |
Gkce Limited 80 Queen Street |
Hauraki Farm Investments Limited Level 4 |
Kirian Farms Limited 188 Quay Street |
Llednarddot Farms Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds St |
Weeks Orchard Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |