Ampli Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429046520258) was started on 18 Dec 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 92 Abel Smith Street, Te Aro, 6011 (type: registered, physical). 214 Main Road, Tawa, Wellington had been their physical address, until 06 Apr 2022. 100000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 31579 shares (31.58 per cent of shares), namely:
Counties Energy Limited (an entity) located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe postcode 2120. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 68.42 per cent of all shares (68421 shares); it includes
Axos Systems Limited (an entity) - located at 119 Featherston Street, Wellington. "Computer consultancy service" (business classification M700010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Ampli Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 13 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 92 Abel Smith Street, Te Aro, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Conrad Stewart Harvey
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 18 Dec 2017 |
Director | 18 Dec 2017 - current |
Stephen Martin Peterson
Island Bay, Wellington, 6023
Address used since 12 Mar 2018 |
Director | 12 Mar 2018 - current |
Sheridan Adelene Broadbent
Rd 1, Papakura, 2580
Address used since 18 Dec 2017 |
Director | 18 Dec 2017 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Samuel Edward Falloon
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 18 Dec 2017 |
Director | 18 Dec 2017 - 12 Mar 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
214 Main Road, Tawa, Wellington, 5028 | Physical & registered | 27 Feb 2018 - 06 Apr 2022 |
Level 5, 117 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 18 Dec 2017 - 27 Feb 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Counties Energy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038874208 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
18 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Axos Systems Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031385497 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
119 Featherston Street Wellington 6011 |
18 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baker, Jason Shaun Individual |
Island Bay Wellington 6023 |
18 Dec 2017 - 24 Jun 2019 |
Sri Sai Hair & Beauty Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Csr Cleaning Services Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tfs Corporate Trustees Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tinakori Flooring Commercial Limited 214 Main Road |
|
S S Khan Asset Management Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tinakori Flooring Asset Management Limited 214 Main Road |
Isa Consulting Limited 214 Main Road |
Abbeyhill Limited 214 Main Road |
Brijworks Limited 25 Ngatitoa Street |
Strepit Consultancy Limited 25 Ngatitoa Street |
Babich Consultants Limited 47 Chester Road |
Craftware Computing Limited 10 Chester Road |