Cc Distributors 2021 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429046317254) was started on 23 Aug 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Annex 1, 27 Gillies Ave, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, service). 7B/19 Edwin Street,, Mt Eden, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 29 Jan 2021. Cc Distributors 2021 Limited used more names, namely: Cc Distributors Limited from 17 Feb 2021 to 15 Jul 2021, Clean Corp Supplies Limited (23 Jun 2020 to 17 Feb 2021) and Cleancorp Taranaki Limited (23 Aug 2017 - 23 Jun 2020). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Gfg Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. "Office cleaning service" (business classification N731125) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Cc Distributors 2021 Limited. Our information was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Annex 1, 27 Gillies Ave, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service & registered | 29 Jan 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brian Richard Fitzgerald
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 01 May 2024
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 01 Sep 2022
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 01 Jun 2021 |
Director | 01 Jun 2021 - current |
George Richard Fitzgerald
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 15 Feb 2019 |
Director | 15 Feb 2019 - 04 Jun 2021 |
Loraine Penelope Reinsfield
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 07 Aug 2018 |
Director | 07 Aug 2018 - 20 Jan 2021 |
Brian Richard Fitzgerald
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 23 Aug 2017 |
Director | 23 Aug 2017 - 10 Aug 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7b/19 Edwin Street,, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & physical | 17 Aug 2020 - 29 Jan 2021 |
7b/19 Edwin Street,, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & physical | 27 Jun 2019 - 17 Aug 2020 |
Suite 1, 17 Huron Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered | 23 Aug 2017 - 27 Jun 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gfg Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046490605 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
03 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cleancorp New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041200841 Company Number: 5154941 Entity |
23 Aug 2017 - 03 Jul 2019 | |
Cleancorp New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041200841 Company Number: 5154941 Entity |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
23 Aug 2017 - 03 Jul 2019 |
Pet Logic Limited Suite 5, Level 4 |
|
Kepa Foundation Charitable Trust Board C/o Kepa Financial Services Limited |
|
Colourama Printing Studio Limited 5 Auburn Street |
|
The Next Station Cafe Limited 16 Como Street |
|
Taylor And Park Associates Limited Green Cross Clinic, 4 Auburn Street |
|
Kw Cave Trust Company Limited Level 3 |
Ever Glory Company Limited Flat 2, 8 Dallinghoe Crescent |
Hillman And Gary Limited 31a Mannering Place |
N.m Facility Service Limited 12 Kenmure Avenue |
S & K Park Limited 35 Greenvalley Rise |
D & J Magic Limited 3 Cockayne Crescent |
Sai Partners Limited 12 Sequoia Place |