Mangapapa Valley Limited (issued a business number of 9429046248084) was started on 18 Jul 2017. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 1147 Kohekohe Kariotahi Road, Rd3, Waiuku, 2683 (type: registered, service). 1147 Kohekohe-Karioitahi Road, Waiuku had been their registered address, up until 09 Sep 2019. 1200 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 400 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
North, Kerryn Adel (a director) located at Rd 2, Onewhero postcode 2697. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 33.33% of all shares (400 shares); it includes
Ryan, Glenys Mary (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Pollok,
Glenys Ryan (a director) - located at Rd3, Waiuku. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (400 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Reid, Christopher Peter, located at Rd 2, Onewhero (a director). "Beef cattle farming" (business classification A014220) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Mangapapa Valley Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
246 Allen And Eyre Road, Rd 2, Onewhero, 2697 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Sep 2019 |
246 Allen And Eyre Road, Rd 2, Onewhero, 2697 | Postal & office | 24 Jul 2020 |
1147 Kohekohe Kariotahi Road, Rd3, Waiuku, 2683 | Registered & service | 16 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Peter Reid
Rd3, Waiuku, 2386
Address used since 06 Jul 2024
Rd 3, Waiuku, 2678
Address used since 18 Jul 2017
Rd2, Tuakau, 2697
Address used since 25 Jul 2018 |
Director | 18 Jul 2017 - current |
Kerryn Adel North
Rd3, Waiuku, 2683
Address used since 06 Jul 2024
Rd2, Tuakau, 2697
Address used since 25 Jul 2018
Rd 3, Waiuku, 2678
Address used since 18 Jul 2017 |
Director | 18 Jul 2017 - current |
Glenys Mary Ryan
Rd 3, Pollok, 2683
Address used since 31 Mar 2021 |
Director | 31 Mar 2021 - current |
Glenys Mary Ryan
Rd3, Waiuku, 2683
Address used since 18 Jul 2017 |
Director | 18 Jul 2017 - 23 Mar 2021 |
246 Allen And Eyre Road , Rd 2 , Onewhero , 2697 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1147 Kohekohe-karioitahi Road, Waiuku, 2683 | Registered | 18 Jul 2017 - 09 Sep 2019 |
1147 Kohekohe-kariotahi Road, Rd3, Waiuku, 2683 | Physical | 18 Jul 2017 - 09 Sep 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
North, Kerryn Adel Director |
Rd 2 Onewhero 2697 |
18 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ryan, Glenys Mary Individual |
Rd 3 Pollok 2683 |
20 May 2021 - current |
Glenys Mary Ryan Director |
Rd3 Waiuku 2683 |
18 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid, Christopher Peter Director |
Rd 2 Onewhero 2697 |
18 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ryan, Glenys Mary Individual |
Rd3 Waiuku 2683 |
18 Jul 2017 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Western Heights Water Company 2012 Limited 23 Ben Westhead Rd |
|
Latuselu Trustee Company Limited 1142 Awhitu Road |
|
Jlgh Limited 1142 Awhitu Road |
|
Henrik's Galloping Gourmet Limited 1096f Awhitu Road |
|
G T S Construction Limited 146 Gleeson Road |
|
Slade Consulting Group Limited 130 Gleeson Road |
Mcmurtry Farms Limited 57 Queen Street |
Aq Farms Limited 257 Clarks Beach Road |
Charm Limited 382 Glenbrook Station Road |
Airstrip Road Grazing Company Limited 104 Cornwall Road |
E G Balle Holdings Limited 37 Sanctuary Drive |
Ryan Road Limited 22c Ryan Road |