Mograph Limited (NZBN 9429046226167) was registered on 05 Jul 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 46 Stanley Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). Apartment 903 The Metropolis Apartments, 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 03 Aug 2021. Mograph Limited used other names, namely: Madas 106 Limited from 04 Jul 2017 to 06 Jul 2017. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Buchanan, Benjamin John (an individual) located at Mount Albert, Auckland postcode 1025. "Business management service nec" (business classification M696210) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Mograph Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 46 Stanley Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service & registered | 03 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Benjamin John Buchanan
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 05 Jul 2017 |
Director | 05 Jul 2017 - current |
Saskia Marsh
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 06 Jul 2017 |
Director | 06 Jul 2017 - current |
Howard Karl Taylor
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 05 Jul 2017 |
Director | 05 Jul 2017 - 06 Jul 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Apartment 903 The Metropolis Apartments, 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 10 Sep 2020 - 03 Aug 2021 |
Apartment 1503 The Metropolis Apartments, 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 03 Sep 2018 - 10 Sep 2020 |
Apartment 2108, 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 05 Jul 2017 - 03 Sep 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Buchanan, Benjamin John Individual |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 |
05 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Howard Karl Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
05 Jul 2017 - 05 Jul 2017 |
Miko Asia Limited Apartment 3403, 1 Courthouse Lane |
|
Yorkville Properties Limited Apartment 3404, 1 Courthouse Lane |
|
East Finchley Properties Limited 3404/1 Courthouse Lane |
|
Zhivago Properties Limited Apartment 3404, 1 Courthouse Lane |
|
Primo Italiano Limited 1 Courthouse Lane |
|
Purdue Properties Limited Apartment 3404, 1 Courthouse Lane |
Dakota Management Limited Apartment 2109, 1 Courthouse Lane |
New Zealand Land Fund 2 Gp No. 2 Limited Level 3 |
New Zealand Land Fund 2 Securities Limited Level 3 |
New Zealand Land Fund 2 Developments Limited Level 3 |
Marshall Stack Holdings Limited 55 Shortland Street |
Roncon Pacific Hotel Management Holdings 2 Limited Level 14, 7 City Road, Auckland Central |