T & H New Zealand Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429046060402) was registered on 06 Apr 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 21 Hororata Road, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Tan, Laura Wanli (a director) located at Hauraki, Auckland postcode 0622. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Xiao, Jianmei (an individual) - located at Mount Wellington, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (48 shares, 48%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
The Tans Family Trust, located at Hauraki, Auckland (an other). "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the ABS issued to T & H New Zealand Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 23 Feb 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21 Hororata Road, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Apr 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Allan Zhonglun Tan
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 06 Apr 2017 |
Director | 06 Apr 2017 - current |
Laura Wanli Tan
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 06 Apr 2017 |
Director | 06 Apr 2017 - current |
Jianmei Xiao
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 01 May 2021 |
Director | 01 May 2021 - 02 Dec 2021 |
21 Hororata Road , Hauraki , Auckland , 0622 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tan, Laura Wanli Director |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
02 Dec 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Xiao, Jianmei Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Tans Family Trust Other (Other) |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
04 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tan, Allan Zhonglun Director |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
02 Dec 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tan, Laura Wanli Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
06 Apr 2017 - 10 May 2021 |
Xiao, Jianmei Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
10 May 2021 - 02 Dec 2021 |
Xiao, Jianmei Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
10 May 2021 - 10 May 2021 |
Tan, Allan Zhonglun Director |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
06 Apr 2017 - 10 May 2021 |
Huang, Yutai Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
04 May 2017 - 09 Mar 2018 |
Larga Trading Limited 21a Hororata Road |
|
Tans Developments Limited 21 Hororata Road |
|
Breaken Ridge Management Services Limited 17a Hororata Road |
|
Barrys Point Motors 2015 Limited 25 Hororata Road |
|
Mc Canan Trustee Limited 31 Hororata Rd |
|
Moneyed Investments No 2 Limited 31 Hororata Road |
Arbroath Holdings Limited 1/14 Clifton Road |
Il Casanova Limited 78 Francis Street |
Paraparaumu 24/7 Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
Cbd Mortgages Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
Hopper Group Limited 23 Park Avenue |
Mst Holdings Limited 35 Walter Street |