Eurofins Environment Testing Nz Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429046024954) was registered on 20 Mar 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 35 O'rorke Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 (type: registered, physical). 6535 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 6535 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Abn 99 612 485 819 - Eurofins Australia New Zealand Holding Pty. Ltd. (an other) located at Dandenong South, Victoria postcode 3175. "Laboratory operation" (ANZSIC M692525) is the classification the ABS issued to Eurofins Environment Testing Nz Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35 O'rorke Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Francis Sefton Mcgraw
Murrumbeena, Victoria, 3163
Address used since 16 Feb 2024 |
Director | 16 Feb 2024 - current |
Martyn William Taylor
Sylvania Waters, Nsw, 2224
Address used since 01 May 2024 |
Director | 01 May 2024 - current |
Glenn Andrew Jackson
Victoria, 3152
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Victoria, 3175
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 01 Jul 2022 - 01 May 2024 |
Yvonne Dickson
Dandenong South, Vic, 3175
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Mount Martha, Victoria, 3934
Address used since 01 Nov 2022 |
Director | 01 Nov 2022 - 19 Feb 2024 |
Sarah Aurelie Thevenet
Hawthorn East, Victoria, 3123
Address used since 31 Aug 2021
Victoria, 3175
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Hawthorn, East Victoria, 3123
Address used since 23 Apr 2020
Hawthorn, Victoria, 3122
Address used since 20 Mar 2017 |
Director | 20 Mar 2017 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Francis Sefton Mcgraw
Murrumbeena, Victoria, 3163
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Oakleigh, Victoria, 3166
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Oakleigh, Victoria, 3166
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Dandenong South, Victoria, 3175
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 20 Mar 2017 - 01 Jul 2022 |
Udit Bhan Singh
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 20 Mar 2017 |
Director | 20 Mar 2017 - 19 Feb 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Abn 99 612 485 819 - Eurofins Australia New Zealand Holding Pty. Ltd. Other (Other) |
Dandenong South Victoria 3175 |
20 Mar 2017 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Eurofins Scientific S.e. |
Type | Listed Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | LU |
Eurofins Agroscience Testing NZ Limited 35 O' Rorke Road |
|
Eurofins Agroscience Services NZ Limited 35 O' Rorke Road |
|
Eurofins Food Analytics NZ Limited 35 O'rorke Road |
|
Precision Turning & Machining Limited 21 O'rorke Road |
|
Hydraulink Fluid Connectors Limited 21 O'rorke Road |
|
Get Laser Limited 1 Rockridge Avenue |
Eurofins Agroscience Testing NZ Limited 35 O' Rorke Road |
Biodet Services Limited Unit K, 383 Khyber Pass Road |
Pokeno West Limited 12 Averton Place |
Bioforce Limited 58 Sir William Avenue |
Emc Technologies (nz) Limited Level 8, 139 Quay Street |
Temsec Auckland Limited Flat 1, 25 Seymour Road |