Prosoftnz Limited (issued a business number of 9429045990861) was started on 09 Mar 2017. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 1 Lilac Lane, Oteha, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, registered). 32A Bodi Place, Te Atatu South, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 04 Aug 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
O'reilly, Shaun (a director) located at Oteha, Auckland postcode 0632. "Software development service nec" (ANZSIC M700050) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Prosoftnz Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Lilac Lane, Oteha, Auckland, 0632 | Postal & office & delivery | 27 Jul 2021 |
1 Lilac Lane, Oteha, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered & service | 04 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shaun O'reilly
Oteha, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
Mangapapa, Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 09 Mar 2017
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 01 Dec 2018 |
Director | 09 Mar 2017 - current |
Anton Christo Watkins
Boardwalk Meander, Pretoria, Gauteng Province, 0081
Address used since 09 Mar 2017 |
Director | 09 Mar 2017 - 30 Jun 2018 |
1 Lilac Lane , Oteha , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
32a Bodi Place, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Registered & physical | 15 Jul 2020 - 04 Aug 2021 |
32a Bodi Place, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Registered & physical | 13 Jul 2020 - 15 Jul 2020 |
9 Whale Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062 | Physical & registered | 13 Dec 2018 - 13 Jul 2020 |
32a Bodi Place, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2018 - 13 Dec 2018 |
110 Don Mckinnon Dr, Albany, Auckland, 0720 | Registered & physical | 17 Aug 2018 - 01 Oct 2018 |
1 Bryce Street, Mangapapa, Gisborne, 4010 | Registered & physical | 09 Mar 2017 - 17 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'reilly, Shaun Director |
Oteha Auckland 0632 |
09 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watkins, Anton Christo Individual |
Boardwalk Meander Pretoria 0081 |
09 Mar 2017 - 09 Aug 2018 |
Motorcycle Touring New Zealand Limited 343 Ormond Road |
|
Pedros Property Limited 359 Ormond Road |
|
Ravla Trading Limited 2 Winter Street |
|
Itek Limited 367 Ormond Road |
|
East Coast Uav Limited 247 Stout Street |
|
Drj Auto Electrical Limited 50 Gordon Street |
Jjlt Limited 1 Haronga Road |
Mk Designs Limited 5 Douglas St |
Aka Software Limited 49 Mangatuna Road |
Mesh Software Limited 14 Appenzell Drive |
Webfox Developments Limited 2 Bridge Street |
Saasi Limited 2 Bridge Street |