Eden Corporate Trustee Limited (NZBN 9429045966446) was incorporated on 20 Feb 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 216 Willis Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Ormiston, Alan Ross (a director) located at Waikanae postcode 5036. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the ABS issued Eden Corporate Trustee Limited. Our information was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
216 Willis Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Feb 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Ross Ormiston
Waikanae, 5036
Address used since 13 Apr 2023
Island Bay, Wellington, 6023
Address used since 31 Mar 2021
Island Bay, Wellington, 6023
Address used since 20 Feb 2017
Kilbirnie, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 20 Feb 2017 |
Director | 20 Feb 2017 - current |
Ross William Ormiston
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 31 Mar 2021 |
Director | 08 Aug 2017 - 19 May 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ormiston, Alan Ross Director |
Waikanae 5036 |
20 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ormiston, Ross William Individual |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
14 Sep 2017 - 24 May 2022 |
Rumba Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
|
Beta Print Limited 216 Willis Street |
|
Dc Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
|
The Red Company Limited Floor 1, 216 Willis Street |
|
Rg & Am Spencer Trust Limited 216 Willis Street |
|
Db Family Trust Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Rumba Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Wassink Family Trust Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Supercharger Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Darlington Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Adams Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |
Kalahari Sands Corporate Trustee Limited 216 Willis Street |