Skinny Hobos Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429045920325) was registered on 15 Mar 2017. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 20 Crossbanks Close, Pukekohe, Auckland, 2120 (type: physical, registered). 20 Alana Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their registered address, until 04 Oct 2021. 2 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (50% of shares), namely:
Ferrier, Alexander Andrew (a director) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Holdom, Samuel James (a director) - located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe. "Entertainer" (business classification R900233) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Skinny Hobos Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Crossbanks Close, Pukekohe, Auckland, 2120 | Postal & office & delivery | 24 Sep 2021 |
20 Crossbanks Close, Pukekohe, Auckland, 2120 | Physical & registered & service | 04 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Samuel James Holdom
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 30 Sep 2020
Dannemora, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 18 Mar 2019
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 15 Mar 2017 |
Director | 15 Mar 2017 - current |
Alexander Andrew Ferrier
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 24 Sep 2021
Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 01 May 2019
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 15 Mar 2017 |
Director | 15 Mar 2017 - current |
20 Crossbanks Close , Pukekohe , Auckland , 2120 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
20 Alana Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical | 08 Oct 2020 - 04 Oct 2021 |
37 Keppoch Court, Dannemora, Auckland, 2016 | Registered & physical | 10 Aug 2018 - 08 Oct 2020 |
51 Water Street, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062 | Registered & physical | 08 May 2018 - 10 Aug 2018 |
74 Namata Road, One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered | 15 Mar 2017 - 08 May 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ferrier, Alexander Andrew Director |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
15 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holdom, Samuel James Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
15 Mar 2017 - current |
South Auckland Taekwon-do School (itf) Unit 1, 21 Rodney Street |
|
The Dental Den Limited 40 Water Street |
|
Sikh International Gurmat Trust (nz) 40 Water Street |
|
Zainab Enterprises Limited 73 High Street |
|
Kiwi Hotel And Motel Supplies Limited Flat 3, 22 Rodney Street |
|
Discount Movers Limited 10 Harmony Avenue |
The Palace Dance Studio Limited 1e Ryan Place |
Dj Pm Limited 215b Marua Road |
Laugh Club New Zealand Limited 30 Fielding Crescent |
Beatworks Limited 132c Marua Road |
R&r Scanlan Company Limited 11a Ambury Road |
Happy Kids Entertainment Limited 11 Towle Place |