Gain Health Centre Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429045838255) was launched on 23 Nov 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 723A Fergusson Drive, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 5018 (type: registered, physical). 120 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Green Cross Health Medical Limited (an entity) located at 602 Great South Road, Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Robertson, Imogen Anne (an individual) - located at Ebdentown, Upper Hutt. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (59 shares, 49.17%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Bowmar, John Geoffrey, located at Ebdentown, Upper Hutt (an individual),
John Gwilliam Trustee Services (No. 2) Limited, located at Upper Hutt (an entity),
Robertson, Imogen Anne, located at Ebdentown, Upper Hutt (an individual). "Clinic - medical - general practice" (ANZSIC Q851110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Gain Health Centre Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
723a Fergusson Drive, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Nov 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Imogen Anne Robertson
Ebdentown, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 23 Nov 2016 |
Director | 23 Nov 2016 - current |
Siobhan Patricia Marshall
Halswell, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 01 Dec 2023 |
Director | 01 Dec 2023 - current |
Wayne John Woolrich
Westshore, Napier, 4110
Address used since 14 Apr 2022 |
Director | 14 Apr 2022 - 01 Dec 2023 |
Elke Bartsch-chantelau
Belmont, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 23 Nov 2016 |
Director | 23 Nov 2016 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green Cross Health Medical Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036134861 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
602 Great South Road, Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
13 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Imogen Anne Individual |
Ebdentown Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bowmar, John Geoffrey Individual |
Ebdentown Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Nov 2016 - current |
John Gwilliam Trustee Services (no. 2) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031423373 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Nov 2016 - current |
Robertson, Imogen Anne Individual |
Ebdentown Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bartsch-chanelau, Elke Individual |
Belmont Lower Hutt 5010 |
23 Nov 2016 - 29 Nov 2016 |
Gane Health Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037880965 Company Number: 900660 Entity |
Belmont Lower Hutt, Wellington |
23 Nov 2016 - 13 Apr 2022 |
Bartsch-chantelau, Elke Individual |
Belmont Lower Hutt 5010 |
29 Nov 2016 - 14 Apr 2022 |
Gane Health Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037880965 Company Number: 900660 Entity |
Belmont Lower Hutt, Wellington |
23 Nov 2016 - 13 Apr 2022 |
Elke Bartsch-chanelau Director |
Belmont Lower Hutt 5010 |
23 Nov 2016 - 29 Nov 2016 |
Morning Light Development Limited 714 Fergusson Drive |
|
Magnolia Wedding And Events Limited 739 Fergusson Drive |
|
Wellington Service Rifle Association Incorporated 106 Martin Street |
|
Upper Hutt School Fundraising Team Incorporated C/-upper Hutt School |
|
Rio Bravo Consulting Limited 98 Martin Street |
|
Total Reclad Solutions Limited 2 Melrose Street |
Robinson Teppett Medical Limited 8e Sierra Way |
Whitby Doctors Limited Whitby Mall |
Carterton Medical Centre (2013) Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Bana-bana Limited 8 Tweed Rd |
The Silverstream Medical Centre Limited 1 Cambridge Terrace |
Titahi Bay Medical Centre Limited 3 Whitehouse Road |