Mawasa Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429045836329) was started on 22 Nov 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 245 Kio Kio Station Rd, Rd4, Otorohanga, 3974 (type: postal, office). 93 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga had been their registered address, up to 26 Apr 2019. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 300 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Maka, Moana (a director) located at Rd 4, Otorohanga postcode 3974. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 35% of all shares (exactly 350 shares); it includes
Maka, Liza (a director) - located at Rd 4, Otorohanga. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (350 shares, 35%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Walker, James, located at Rd 4, Otorohanga (a director). "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Mawasa Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
245 Kio Kio Station Rd, Rd4, Otorohanga, 3974 | Physical & registered & service | 26 Apr 2019 |
245 Kio Kio Station Rd, Rd4, Otorohanga, 3974 | Postal & office & delivery | 02 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Walker
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 24 Apr 2023
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 21 Apr 2017
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 05 Dec 2017 |
Director | 22 Nov 2016 - current |
Liza Maka
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 24 Apr 2023
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 05 Dec 2017
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 21 Apr 2017 |
Director | 22 Nov 2016 - current |
Moana Maka
Rd 4, Otorohanga, 3974
Address used since 24 Apr 2023
Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 21 Apr 2017
Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 05 Dec 2017 |
Director | 22 Nov 2016 - current |
245 Kio Kio Station Rd , Rd4 , Otorohanga , 3974 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
93 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga, 3900 | Registered & physical | 13 Dec 2017 - 26 Apr 2019 |
245 Kio Kio Station Rd, Rd4, Otorohanga, 3974 | Registered & physical | 02 May 2017 - 13 Dec 2017 |
771 Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & physical | 22 Nov 2016 - 02 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maka, Moana Director |
Rd 4 Otorohanga 3974 |
22 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maka, Liza Director |
Rd 4 Otorohanga 3974 |
22 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walker, James Director |
Rd 4 Otorohanga 3974 |
22 Nov 2016 - current |
Lawnmower And Chainsaw Centre (2013) Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
|
Macpherson Trustee Company Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
|
2nd Mile Group Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
|
Progressive Livestock Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
|
Dl Bell Trustee Company Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
|
Harrison Dairy Goats Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
Zenic Enterprises Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
Strategic Property Holdings Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
Smoc-group1 Limited 57 Te Kumi Road |
Beaulieu Investments Limited 228 Leger Grove |
F&r Investments Limited 222 Lethbridge Road |
Jp & Pj Sullivan Limited 123 Rickit Road |