Soul Boul Limited (issued a business number of 9429043416875) was registered on 08 Nov 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 125 Oceanbeach Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 (type: registered, physical). 7 Kapuka Street, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa had been their physical address, up until 10 Nov 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Horton, Stacey Robyn (a director) located at Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui postcode 3116. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Bell, Alexandra Lauren (an individual) - located at Omokoroa, Omokoroa. "Health food retailing" (ANZSIC G412940) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Soul Boul Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Kapuka Street, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 | Postal | 17 Nov 2021 |
208 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 | Office & delivery | 17 Nov 2021 |
125 Oceanbeach Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stacey Robyn Horton
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 09 Dec 2019
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 09 Dec 2019
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 08 Nov 2016 |
Director | 08 Nov 2016 - current |
Alexandra Lauren Bell
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Nov 2023
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 09 Dec 2019
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 08 Nov 2016 |
Director | 08 Nov 2016 - current |
208 Maunganui Road , Mount Maunganui , Mount Maunganui , 3116 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Kapuka Street, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 | Physical & registered | 24 Dec 2019 - 10 Nov 2022 |
38 Bollard Road, Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 | Registered & physical | 08 Nov 2016 - 24 Dec 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horton, Stacey Robyn Director |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
08 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bell, Alexandra Lauren Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
08 Nov 2016 - current |
Vegan Future Trustee Limited 47 Bollard Road |
|
Wheeler Family Trustees Limited 4 Sanctuary Lane |
|
Gails Of Tamahere Limited 28 Devine Road |
|
Exacto Investments Limited 9 D Sanctuary Lane |
|
Karr Group Limited 7 Koppens Road |
|
Wood Works (2012) Limited 7 Koppens Road |
P&j Family Limited 17a Edinburgh Road |
Gegedou Trading Company Limited Flat 2, 6 Page Place |
Mt Tank Limited 18 Jellicoe Drive |
Tank Chartwell Limited 18 Jellicoe Drive |
Tank Tauranga Limited 18 Jellicoe Drive |
Tank Papamoa Limited 18 Jellicoe Drive |