Waller Trust 2016 Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429043352678) was launched on 30 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). 1 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 18 Aug 2017. 12 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 12 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Powle, Donna Maree (a director) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1051. Businesscheck's information was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 18 Aug 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Donna Maree Powle
Epsom, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 30 Sep 2016 |
Director | 30 Sep 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 30 Sep 2016 - 18 Aug 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Powle, Donna Maree Director |
Epsom Auckland 1051 |
30 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodson, Nicholas Marlow Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
10 Aug 2017 - 02 Aug 2023 |
Palmer, Simon Middleton Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
30 Sep 2016 - 10 Aug 2017 |
Arrow Residential Group Limited 1 Broadway |
|
Orpheus Trust Limited Level 2 |
|
Vin Rouge Trust Limited 1 Broadway |
|
Rsm Hayes Audit Limited 1 Broadway |
|
Israelson Trust Limited 1 Broadway |
|
Mpi International Limited 1 Broadway |