Long Island Guides Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429043326907) was launched on 16 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 283 Clifton Road, Te Awanga, 4102 (type: registered, physical). 4 Cooper Street, Havelock North had been their registered address, up until 04 Jun 2019. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Gordon, Edward Lindsay (a director) located at Te Awanga, Te Awanga postcode 4102. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Mcneile, Rebecca (an individual) - located at Te Awanga, Te Awanga. "Tour guide service" (business classification N722040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Long Island Guides Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
283 Clifton Road, Te Awanga, 4102 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Edward Lindsay Gordon
Te Awanga, Te Awanga, 4102
Address used since 16 Sep 2016 |
Director | 16 Sep 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Cooper Street, Havelock North, 4130 | Registered & physical | 17 Aug 2018 - 04 Jun 2019 |
Level 2, 17 Napier Road, Havelock North, 4130 | Registered & physical | 16 Sep 2016 - 17 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gordon, Edward Lindsay Director |
Te Awanga Te Awanga 4102 |
16 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcneile, Rebecca Individual |
Te Awanga Te Awanga 4102 |
16 Sep 2016 - current |
Park Lane Residents' Society Incorporated C/o Mackersey Group |
|
Pareto Trustee Mft Limited 6 Te Mata Road |
|
Ngaruroro Irrigation Society Incorporated C/o Insight Chartered Accountants Ltd |
|
Shennong Variety Management Limited Level 1 |
|
Stafffresh Limited Level 1 |
|
Woodford House Old Girls' Association Endowment Trust Board 1992 C/o Woodford House |
Culinary Events Limited 79 Black Barn Road |
Double Decker Transport Limited 30 Maltby Street |
Little Brown Kiwi New Zealand Limited 76 King Street |
Frankly Tours NZ Limited 178 Vigor Brown Street |
Nztrip4u Limited 20 Lambton Road |
Avantogo Tours Limited 45 Heipipi Drive |