Queenstown-Lakes District Chamber Of Commerce & Industry Incorporated (issued a business number of 9429042810643) was registered on 05 Nov 1991. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 2, Forge Building, 20 Athol Street, Queenstown 9300 (type: registered, postal). Level 2, Forge Building, 20 Athol Street, Queenstown had been their registered address, up to 05 Dec 2022. Businesscheck's database was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Forge Building, 20 Athol Street, Queenstown 9300 | Registered | unknown |
PO BOX 938, QUEENSTOWN 9348 | Postal | unknown |
C/O McCulloch & Partners, 34 Camp Street, Queenstown 9300 | Registered | unknown |
P.O. BOX 938, QUEENSTOWN | Postal | unknown |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Angela Spackman | officer | 20 May 2021 - unknown |
Sharon Fifield | officer | 05 Dec 2022 - unknown |
Ruth Stokes | officer | 01 Feb 2021 - 05 Dec 2022 |
Type | Used since |
---|
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Forge Building, 20 Athol Street, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered | 11 Jun 2019 - 05 Dec 2022 |
The Queenstown $10 Challenge Charitable Trust 34 Camp Street |
|
Otago Country Cricket Association Incorporated C/o Mcculloch & Partners (d Jackson) |
|
Daebak 2015 Limited 7 Beach Street |
|
Kelvin Peninsula Community Association Incorporated C/o Mac Todd |
|
Bruce Grant Memorial Youth Trust C/ Macalister Todd Phillips |
|
Snow Rental Limited 39 Camp Street |