Rugby League Hawkes Bay Incorporated (NZBN 9429042717041) was started on 26 Sep 1994. 1 address is in use by the company: P O Box 1013, Hastings 4156 (type: postal, registered). 1310 Karamu Road, Mayfair, Hastings had been their registered address, up to 04 Jul 2020. Rugby League Hawkes Bay Incorporated used other names, namely: Hawkes Bay District Rugby Football League Incorporated from 26 Sep 1994 to 26 Aug 1996. Our information was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
P O Box 1013, Hastings 4156 | Postal | unknown |
408 Akina Street, Akina, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 04 Jul 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stacey Sullivan | officer | 29 Jul 2024 - unknown |
Kevin Tamati | officer | 01 Jan 2004 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Mike Tamati | officer | 01 Jan 2004 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Shane Foster | officer | 01 Jan 2011 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Te Aroha Hunt | officer | 01 Jan 2015 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Trina Tamati | officer | 01 Jan 2016 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Erena Liddington-rangihuna | officer | 04 Jul 2020 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Rebekah Porou | officer | 21 Oct 2020 - 21 Aug 2024 |
Lee Grace | officer | 01 Jan 2010 - 22 Feb 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1310 Karamu Road, Mayfair, Hastings, 4120 | Registered | 03 Jul 2013 - 04 Jul 2020 |
Maori Agricultural College (mac) Sports And Social Charitable Trust 1310 Karamu Road North |
|
Hawkes Bay Workers Union Incorporated 1310 Karamu Road North |
|
Star Of India Bay Limited 1213 Karamu Road |
|
Bay Spinal Chiropractic Centre Limited 300 Fenwick Street |
|
Karl Schroder Builder Limited 313 Collinge Road |
|
The Riverbend Christian Centre Trust Coffey Davidson |