Onga Land Company Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042559641) was incorporated on 08 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 32 Taupo Quay, Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 (type: service, registered). 32 Taupo Quay, Whanganui, Whanganui had been their registered address, up to 16 Feb 2023. 3500000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 525000 shares (15 per cent of shares), namely:
Illston, Scott Robert (an individual) located at Rd 1, Hunterville postcode 4781,
Meara, Luzia Grace (an individual) located at Rd 1, Hunterville postcode 4781. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 42.5 per cent of all shares (exactly 1487500 shares); it includes
Leary, Lesley Faith (a director) - located at Hunterville, Hunterville. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (1487500 shares, 42.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Leary, Robert Charles, located at Hunterville, Hunterville (a director). Businesscheck's database was updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
32 Taupo Quay, Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 | Physical | 11 May 2020 |
32 Taupo Quay, Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 | Service & registered | 16 Feb 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lesley Faith Leary
Hunterville, Hunterville, 4730
Address used since 23 Jan 2018 |
Director | 23 Jan 2018 - current |
Robert Charles Leary
Hunterville, Hunterville, 4730
Address used since 23 Jan 2018 |
Director | 23 Jan 2018 - current |
John Francis Clifford Henderson
Rd 54, Kimbolton, 4774
Address used since 08 Sep 2016 |
Director | 08 Sep 2016 - 18 Jan 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
32 Taupo Quay, Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 | Registered & service | 11 May 2020 - 16 Feb 2023 |
16 Bell Street, Wanganui, 4501 | Registered & physical | 08 Sep 2016 - 11 May 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Illston, Scott Robert Individual |
Rd 1 Hunterville 4781 |
18 Feb 2022 - current |
Meara, Luzia Grace Individual |
Rd 1 Hunterville 4781 |
18 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leary, Lesley Faith Director |
Hunterville Hunterville 4730 |
01 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leary, Robert Charles Director |
Hunterville Hunterville 4730 |
01 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Henderson, John Francis Clifford Individual |
Rd 54 Kimbolton 4774 |
08 Sep 2016 - 01 Feb 2018 |
John Francis Clifford Henderson Director |
Rd 54 Kimbolton 4774 |
08 Sep 2016 - 01 Feb 2018 |
Lochrin Holdings Limited 16 Bell Street |
|
Bains Limited 16 Bell Street |
|
Orlowski Kuhn Investments Limited 16 Bell Street |
|
Guilford Consultancy Limited 16 Bell Street |
|
Us N Them Limited 16 Bell Street |
|
Physiotherapy Hand Clinic (wanganui) Limited 16 Bell Street |