Indigo Schools Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429042557272) was incorporated on 07 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 197 Musselburgh Rise, Andersons Bay, Dunedin, 9013 (type: registered, physical). 69 Cliff Road, Torbay, Auckland had been their registered address, until 09 Sep 2022. Indigo Schools Limited used other names, namely: Future Learning Group Limited from 07 Sep 2016 to 02 Jul 2021. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcdermott, Sean Steven (a director) located at Sha Tau Kok, New Territories postcode 00000. "Curriculum development, educational" (business classification P822010) is the classification the ABS issued Indigo Schools Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
197 Musselburgh Rise, Andersons Bay, Dunedin, 9013 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Sep 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sean Steven Mcdermott
Ha Tam Shui Hang, Sha Tau Kok, N.t.,
Address used since 01 Jul 2021
Ha Tam Shui Hang, Sha Tau Kok, N.t.,
Address used since 01 Aug 2019
Rd 1, Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 07 Sep 2016
Jalan Sierramas Barat, Sungai Buloh, Selangor, 47000
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 07 Sep 2016 - current |
Yoke Yen Lee
Andersons Bay, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 12 Aug 2022 |
Director | 12 Aug 2022 - current |
Bryan Alan Phillips
Torbay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - 01 Sep 2022 |
David Patrick Mcdermott
Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 01 Jan 2018 - 26 Jul 2021 |
1967 Ngunguru Road , Rd 3 , Whangarei , 0173 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
69 Cliff Road, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 03 Aug 2021 - 09 Sep 2022 |
1967 Ngunguru Road, Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173 | Registered & physical | 16 Apr 2018 - 03 Aug 2021 |
935 Purerua Road, Rd 1, Kerikeri, 0294 | Registered & physical | 07 Sep 2016 - 16 Apr 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdermott, Sean Steven Director |
Sha Tau Kok New Territories 00000 |
07 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillips, Bryan Alan Individual |
Torbay Auckland 0630 |
26 Jul 2021 - 01 Sep 2022 |
Cyx Enterprises Limited 1969 Ngunguru Road |
|
Nexon Holdings Limited 1977 Ngunguru Road |
|
Ngunguru Sports & Recreation Society Incorporated Kopipi Cres |
|
The Batch 33 Limited 33 Kopipi Crescent |
|
Bechange Limited 6 Pine Road |
Fluency Limited 36 Shoebridge Crescent |
Out Of Left Field Limited 290 Cullen Road |
Girlboss Limited 64 Rosario Crescent |
Integrated Education Limited 137 Brian Crescent |
Kaihanga Limited 232 Munn Road |
Special Addition Limited 11 Bayside Drive |