Paula Melton Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042546634) was started on 02 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 167 Maraetai Drive,, Maraetai, Auckland, 2018 (type: registered, physical). 7 Kambalda Street, Mangere Bridge, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 09 Mar 2022. Paula Melton Limited used more names, namely: Be Covered Limited from 31 Aug 2016 to 03 Apr 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Melton, Paula Rose (a director) located at Maraetai, Auckland postcode 2018. "Financial service nec" (business classification K641915) is the category the ABS issued to Paula Melton Limited. Our information was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
167 Maraetai Drive,, Maraetai, Auckland, 2018 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Rose Melton
Maraetai, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Mangere Bridge, Auckland, 2022
Address used since 01 Apr 2018
Mangere, Auckland, 2022
Address used since 01 Nov 2016 |
Director | 01 Nov 2016 - current |
Alina Jane Hooper
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 02 Sep 2016 |
Director | 02 Sep 2016 - 01 Apr 2018 |
7 Kambalda Street , Mangere Bridge , Auckland , 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Kambalda Street, Mangere Bridge, Auckland, 2022 | Physical & registered | 14 Feb 2019 - 09 Mar 2022 |
232 Jack Lachlan Drive, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 | Registered & physical | 02 Sep 2016 - 14 Feb 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Melton, Paula Rose Director |
Maraetai Auckland 2018 |
22 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hooper, Alina Jane Individual |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 |
02 Sep 2016 - 09 Apr 2018 |
Hooper, Matthew William Individual |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 |
02 Sep 2016 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Alina Jane Hooper Director |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 |
02 Sep 2016 - 09 Apr 2018 |
K A Willcocks Builders Limited 14 Tui Brae |
|
Doca Holdings Limited R29 190 Jack Lachlan Drive |
|
Specialist Linings Limited R29 190 Jack Lachlan Drive |
|
Jkf International Limited 190 Jack Lachlan Drive |
|
Pine Harbour Boat Painters 2014 Limited 190 Jack Lachlan Drive |
|
Pine Harbour Trustee Company Limited 190 Jack Lachlan Drive |
Ying Yu NZ Company Limited 6 Sligo Place |
Ihome Mortgage Service Limited 40a O'halloran Road |
NZ Insure Limited 154 Bucklands Beach Road |
New Zealand Finance Solutions Limited 14a Bucklands Beach Road |
Forli Partners Limited 128 Ara-kotinga |
Dolly Gorasia Limited Unit 6, 12 Amera Place |