Ceylon Trading Private Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429042516965) was incorporated on 15 Aug 2016. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 141 Stoddard Road, Wesley, Auckland, 1041 (type: registered, service). 164 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 23 Apr 2021. 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 200 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Mahroof, Ahamed Mafaz (a director) located at Yagoona, Nsw postcode 2199. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 80 per cent of all shares (800 shares); it includes
Firowze, Mohammed Jaheer (a director) - located at Hillsborough, Auckland. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
13 Hillsborough Road, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Apr 2021 |
212 Stoddard Road, Wesley, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & service | 03 Mar 2023 |
141 Stoddard Road, Wesley, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & service | 16 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ahamed Mafaz Mahroof
Auburn Arcade, Auburn, Nsw, 2144
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Yagoona, Nsw, 2199
Address used since 15 Aug 2016 |
Director | 15 Aug 2016 - current |
Mohammed Jaheer Firowze
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 15 Aug 2016
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 30 Oct 2019 |
Director | 15 Aug 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
164 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Physical | 16 May 2019 - 23 Apr 2021 |
164 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Registered | 15 May 2019 - 23 Apr 2021 |
141 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Physical | 15 Aug 2016 - 16 May 2019 |
141 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Registered | 15 Aug 2016 - 15 May 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mahroof, Ahamed Mafaz Director |
Yagoona Nsw 2199 |
15 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firowze, Mohammed Jaheer Director |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
15 Aug 2016 - current |
Sthaan E Maharaj Limited 141b Stoddard Road |
|
Alert Barbers (05) Limited 141b Stoddard Road |
|
Alert Barber Limited 141b Stoddard Road |
|
Bismillah Trading NZ Limited 4a/151 Stoddard Road |
|
Kalai Enterprises Limited 788 Sandringham Road Extension |
|
Total Infrastructure Limited 116 Stoddard Road |