Corbett & Co Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429042492122) was registered on 02 Aug 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 806 Omahu Road, Frimley, Hastings, 4120 (type: physical, registered). Flat 3, 16 Balfour Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 26 May 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Corbett, Sonja (a director) located at Thornlands, Queensland postcode 4164. "Internet web site design service" (business classification M700040) is the classification the ABS issued to Corbett & Co Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
806 Omahu Road, Frimley, Hastings, 4120 | Physical & registered & service | 26 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sonja Corbett
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 18 Dec 2016
Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 02 Aug 2016 - current |
Sonja Kutner
Thornlands, 4164
Address used since 22 Dec 2023
Coorparoo, Brisbane, 4151
Address used since 25 Jan 2023
Esquina Gonchi Rodriguez - Apto A020, Canelones,
Address used since 17 May 2021
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 06 Feb 2019 |
Director | 02 Aug 2016 - current |
Robyn Lee Kiddle
Frimley, Hastings, 4120
Address used since 17 May 2021
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 01 Apr 2019 |
Director | 01 Apr 2019 - current |
806 Omahu Rd , Frimley , Hastings , 4120 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 3, 16 Balfour Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 23 Apr 2019 - 26 May 2021 |
17 Lyndhurst Road, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Registered | 01 Oct 2018 - 23 Apr 2019 |
17 Lyndhurst Road, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Physical | 04 May 2018 - 23 Apr 2019 |
3/16 Balfour Road, Sandringham, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 02 Aug 2016 - 04 May 2018 |
3/16 Balfour Road, Sandringham, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 02 Aug 2016 - 01 Oct 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Corbett, Sonja Director |
Thornlands Queensland 4164 |
02 Aug 2016 - current |
Crown Properties New Zealand Limited 15a Lyndhurst Road |
|
Fitness World Limited 15a Lyndhurst Road |
|
Precious Metal Services (1990) Limited 16 Lyndhurst Road |
|
Applied Technology Limited 8 Wakeling Avenue |
|
Morton Media Services Limited 10 Wakeling Avenue |
|
Methven Historical Society Incorporated C/-mrs N J Robertson |
Rx International Trading Limited 16 Jaemont Avenue |
Sunset Studios Limited 81 Mcleod Road |
First Data Systems Limited 42 Danica Esplanade |
Design Wizards Limited 4 Provence Esplanade |
Bbt Digital Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
Rumbold Inc Limited 53 Fitzwater Place |