Sanbao Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429042418344) was registered on 22 Jun 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Hazel Glen, Bayview, Auckland, 0629 (type: physical, service). 10 Paradise Place, Pakuranga, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 11 Aug 2017. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Wang, Xiao (an individual) located at Bayview, Auckland postcode 0629. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Ni, Bing (a director) - located at Bayview, Auckland. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Sanbao Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Hazel Glen, Bayview, Auckland, 0629 | Physical & service & registered | 11 Aug 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bing Ni
Bayview, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 22 Jun 2016 |
Director | 22 Jun 2016 - current |
Xiao Wang
Bayview, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 01 Jan 2023 |
Director | 01 Jan 2023 - current |
18 Hazel Glen , Bayview , Auckland , 0629 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Paradise Place, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical | 07 Jul 2016 - 11 Aug 2017 |
Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 22 Jun 2016 - 07 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wang, Xiao Individual |
Bayview Auckland 0629 |
04 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ni, Bing Director |
Bayview Auckland 0629 |
22 Jun 2016 - current |
Bwn Limited 18 Hazel Glen |
|
Mu+ni Family Investments Limited 18 Hazel Glen |
|
Bo Hai X. International Limited 13 Hazel Glen |
|
Bo Hai L. International Limited 13 Hazel Glen |
|
Harry And Margaret Perkins Trustee Limited 18 Daldys Bush Lane |
|
Go Digital Limited 16 Daldys Bush Lane |
Bandk Enterprises Limited 28 Daldys Bush Lane |
Drc The Palm House Management Limited 15 Daldys Bush Lane |
Menon Homes Limited 7 Bronzewing Terrace |
Forever Prosperous Investment Limited 12 Azure Grove |
Zjs Rentals Limited 27 Unsworth Drive |
Deer Real Estate & Rental Property Limited 19a Bonito Place |