Groves Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042374923) was started on 26 May 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 123A Apirana Avenue, Glen Innes, Auckland, 1072 (type: registered, physical). 4 Elias Court, The Gardens, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 21 Jun 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Tang, Zhifen (a director) located at The Gardens, Auckland postcode 2105. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Groves, Paul Andrew (a director) - located at The Gardens, Auckland. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the ABS issued Groves Limited. Our information was last updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
123a Apirana Avenue, Glen Innes, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Andrew Groves
The Gardens, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 26 May 2016 |
Director | 26 May 2016 - current |
Zhifen Tang
The Gardens, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 26 May 2016 |
Director | 26 May 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Elias Court, The Gardens, Auckland, 2105 | Registered & physical | 17 Jun 2021 - 21 Jun 2021 |
Level 6, Staircase House, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 27 May 2020 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Level 6, East On Quay, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 26 May 2016 - 27 May 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tang, Zhifen Director |
The Gardens Auckland 2105 |
26 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Groves, Paul Andrew Director |
The Gardens Auckland 2105 |
26 May 2016 - current |
Aman And Ameet Holdings Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Fames5 Investments Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Valdo Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Durbin Holding Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
R Bull Enterprises Limited Level 6, Nzinvest House |
|
Picinini Property Invest Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Aman And Ameet Holdings Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Fames5 Investments Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Valdo Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Durbin Holding Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Picinini Property Invest Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
Richma Investments Limited Level 6, East On Quay |