Gaze Burt Trustees 16 Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042159629) was incorporated on 10 Feb 2016. 1 address is in use by the company: Level 5, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). One Nelson Street, Auckland City had been their registered address, until 28 Sep 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Rachael Marie Jhinku (a director) located at Greenhithe, Auckland postcode 0632,
Michael Bright (a director) located at Greenhithe, Auckland postcode 0632,
Michael Hockly (a director) located at Northcote, Auckland postcode 0627. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Gaze Burt Trustees 16 Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 30 Oct 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 28 Sep 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael James Bright
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 10 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Feb 2016 - current |
Michael John Hockly
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 10 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Feb 2016 - current |
Leslie Ross Allen
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 10 Feb 2016
Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 06 Sep 2018 |
Director | 10 Feb 2016 - current |
Kimberly Knox
Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 27 Jan 2021 |
Director | 27 Jan 2021 - current |
Shelley Elizabeth Eden
Wai O Taiki Bay, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 05 Mar 2022 |
Director | 05 Mar 2022 - current |
Rachael Marie Jhinku
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 05 Mar 2022 |
Director | 05 Mar 2022 - current |
Daniel Alexander Smith
Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 10 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Feb 2016 - 01 Apr 2020 |
David Stanley Munn
Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 10 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Feb 2016 - 10 Nov 2016 |
Level 5, 57 Symonds Street , Grafton , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
One Nelson Street, Auckland City, 1110 | Registered & physical | 10 Feb 2016 - 28 Sep 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rachael Marie Jhinku Director |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
22 Mar 2022 - current |
Michael James Bright Director |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
22 Mar 2022 - current |
Michael John Hockly Director |
Northcote Auckland 0627 |
10 Feb 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leslie Ross Allen Director |
Lynfield Auckland 1042 |
10 Feb 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
J A Davey Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |
|
Aquaknight Industries Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
|
Mr White Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Mjic Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Cj Cafe Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Rd |
|
Country Treasures Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Keay Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Hannan Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Gaze Burt Trustees 13 Limited Level 5, 57 Symonds Street |
Hastie Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Trustee Corporation (hen170) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
Trustee Corporation (no. 4) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |