Aohua Construction Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042120711) was incorporated on 17 Dec 2015. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 69 Wai-Iti Terrace, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 (type: registered, service). 7 Handley Crescent, Wigram, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 07 Oct 2020. Aohua Construction Limited used more aliases, namely: Zit Limited from 17 Dec 2015 to 04 Feb 2020. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 5 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Hu, Fan (an individual) located at Wigram, Christchurch postcode 8042,
Jiang, Yiqin (an individual) located at Shanghai postcode 200080,
Zhang, Yikang (an individual) located at Shanghai postcode 200080. "Construction project management service - fee or contract basis" (ANZSIC M692325) is the category the ABS issued to Aohua Construction Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Handley Crescent, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & service | 17 Dec 2015 |
332 Kennedys Bush Road, Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 | Registered | 07 Oct 2020 |
69 Wai-iti Terrace, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & service | 12 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhe Zhang
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 04 Sep 2023
Wigram, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 17 Dec 2015 |
Director | 17 Dec 2015 - current |
Chang Zhang
Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 01 Feb 2020 |
Director | 01 Feb 2020 - 01 Apr 2023 |
332 Kennedys Bush Road , Kennedys Bush , Christchurch , 8025 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Handley Crescent, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered | 17 Dec 2015 - 07 Oct 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hu, Fan Individual |
Wigram Christchurch 8042 |
23 Jun 2023 - current |
Jiang, Yiqin Individual |
Shanghai 200080 |
26 Oct 2022 - current |
Zhang, Yikang Individual |
Shanghai 200080 |
26 Oct 2022 - current |
Hu, Yifang Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
31 Mar 2022 - current |
Zhang, Zhe Director |
Wigram Christchurch 8042 |
28 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liu, Dan Individual |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 |
21 Jul 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Zhang, Chang Individual |
Christchurch 8025 |
12 Mar 2020 - 13 Nov 2023 |
Liang, Xiaoping Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
31 Mar 2022 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Liang, Xiaoping Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
31 Mar 2022 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Zhou, Mingzhe Individual |
Wuhan City 430000 |
12 Mar 2020 - 07 Apr 2021 |
Zhou, Mingzhe Individual |
Wuhan City 430000 |
12 Mar 2020 - 07 Apr 2021 |
Zhou, Mingzhe Individual |
Wuhan City 430000 |
12 Mar 2020 - 07 Apr 2021 |
Zhang, Zhe Director |
Wigram Christchurch 8042 |
17 Dec 2015 - 21 Jul 2020 |
Zhang, Zhe Director |
Wigram Christchurch 8042 |
17 Dec 2015 - 21 Jul 2020 |
Zhou, Mingzhe Individual |
Wuhan City 430000 |
08 Feb 2020 - 05 Mar 2020 |
H & Z Limited 7 Handley Crescent |
|
Kittyhawk Cartage Limited 8 Spitfire Place |
|
Seymour Street Limited 2 Spitfire Place |
|
Nek NZ Limited 43 Sioux Avenue |
|
Herculeanz Limited 15 Sioux Avenue |
|
Crt Consulting Limited 22 Mustang Avenue |
Boss Equities Limited Unit 1b 55 Epsom Road |
Pb Projects Limited 61 Somerville Crescent |
Track Consulting Limited 96 Shands Road |
Sunland International Limited 13 Calverton Place |
Razl Projects Limited 78 Checketts Avenue |
M P R Engineering Limited 10 Millesimes Way |