Supremeroadtrip Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042080688) was incorporated on 23 Nov 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 53A Moore Street, Hillcrest., Auckland, 0627 (type: registered, physical). 22 Merriefield Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland had been their physical address, until 08 Aug 2018. 10000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 9000 shares (90% of shares), namely:
Gu, Wei (a director) located at Hillcrest, Auckland postcode 0627. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Burnett, Carl (an individual) - located at Somerfield, Christchurch. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (500 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Berkel, Rodger Van, located at Somerfield, Christchurch (an individual). "Tour guide service" (ANZSIC N722040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Supremeroadtrip Limited. Our database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
53a Moore Street, Hillcrest., Auckland, 0627 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wei Gu
Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 21 Sep 2018
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 14 Feb 2017 |
Director | 23 Nov 2015 - current |
Harvey James Dixon
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 12 Jan 2017 |
Director | 12 Jan 2017 - 31 Jan 2021 |
22 Merriefield Avenue , Forrest Hill , Auckland , 0620 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
22 Merriefield Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 22 Feb 2017 - 08 Aug 2018 |
Unit C518, 176 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 23 Aug 2016 - 22 Feb 2017 |
Level 27/188 Quay Street, Auckland City, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 22 Mar 2016 - 23 Aug 2016 |
Level 27/188 Quay Street, Auckland City, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 22 Mar 2016 - 22 Feb 2017 |
6e/100 Anzac Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 23 Nov 2015 - 22 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gu, Wei Director |
Hillcrest Auckland 0627 |
23 Nov 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burnett, Carl Individual |
Somerfield Christchurch 8024 |
12 Jan 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Berkel, Rodger Van Individual |
Somerfield Christchurch 8024 |
12 Jan 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dixon, Harvey James Individual |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 |
12 Jan 2017 - 31 Jan 2021 |
Ch2 Commercial Cleaning Limited 5 Meadowvale Avenue |
|
Fern Digital Limited 49a Merriefield Avenue |
|
Tolans Investments Limited 26 Meadowvale Avenue |
|
Quest Accounting Limited 172a Forrest Hill Road |
|
Metavest Limited 172a Forrest Hill Road |
|
Great North Centre Limited 172a Forrest Hill Road |
New Zealand Tours & Business Limited 86 Parr Terrace |
Promo Me Limited Unit 1, 65 Ellice Road |
Happy Tour Limited 41 Chester Avenue |
The Kiwi Bucket List Limited 40 Deuxberry Avenue |
Tng Pacific Limited 1/616 Beach Road |
Green Gourmet Limited 14a Onepoto Road |