Devon Foods Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042069843) was registered on 09 Dec 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 20A Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: service, registered). 20A Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland had been their service address, until 10 Feb 2023. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 65 shares (65 per cent of shares), namely:
Luo, Wei (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 15 per cent of all shares (15 shares); it includes
Zhou, Hao (an individual) - located at Wanke City Garden Shunyi, Bei Jing. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (20 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Qi, Fei, located at Meirandong Lijequ, Bei Jing (an individual). "Food wholesaling nec" (business classification F360915) is the category the ABS issued Devon Foods Limited. Our data was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20a Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical | 14 Oct 2021 |
20a Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered | 05 Jul 2022 |
20a Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Service | 10 Feb 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wei Luo
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Oct 2021 |
Director | 01 Oct 2021 - current |
Wei Lou
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Oct 2021 |
Director | 01 Oct 2021 - current |
Xin Hu
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 02 Aug 2018 |
Director | 02 Aug 2018 - 01 Oct 2021 |
David John Dolbel
Wiamauku, Auckland, 0812
Address used since 09 Dec 2015 |
Director | 09 Dec 2015 - 02 Aug 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
20a Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Service | 14 Oct 2021 - 10 Feb 2023 |
20a Wiles Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical | 15 Aug 2018 - 14 Oct 2021 |
86 Trig Road, Whenuapai, Auckland, 0618 | Registered | 15 Aug 2018 - 05 Jul 2022 |
20 Sarah Todd Lane, Waimauku, Waimauku, 0812 | Physical & registered | 09 Dec 2015 - 15 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luo, Wei Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
01 Feb 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhou, Hao Individual |
Wanke City Garden Shunyi Bei Jing |
09 Dec 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Qi, Fei Individual |
Meirandong Lijequ Bei Jing |
09 Dec 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dolbel, Karen Anita Individual |
Waimauku Auckland 0812 |
09 Dec 2015 - 17 Jun 2019 |
Hu, Xin Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2015 - 06 Oct 2021 |
Lou, Wei Director |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
06 Oct 2021 - 01 Feb 2023 |
Hu, Xin Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2015 - 06 Oct 2021 |
Hu, Xin Individual |
Waimauku Auckland 0812 |
09 Dec 2015 - 06 Oct 2021 |
Dolbel, Karen Anita Individual |
Waimauku Auckland 0812 |
09 Dec 2015 - 17 Jun 2019 |
Selola Limited 39 Rosella Grove |
|
Waitakere Valuation Services Limited 39 Rosella Grove |
|
Hallewills Investments Limited 46 Rosella Grove |
|
G.j. Wills Limited 46 Rosella Grove |
|
Business Brief Limited 34 Sarah Todd Lane |
|
Todd Water Company Limited 34 Sarah Todd Lane |
Crescent Dairy Co Limited 1091 Old North Road |
Nzqueenbee Apiary Limited 61a Fred Taylor Drive |
Taikoo Property Management Limited 35a Mcclintock Road |
United Produce Limited 1 Kauri Road |
Central Auckland Franchisee Limited 17 Carling Avenue |
Sunis New Zealand Trading Co., Limited 28 Lockheed Street |