Devon Eatery Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042043294) was registered on 02 Nov 2015. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 418 Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 (type: registered, service). 1 Queens Parade, Devonport, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 22 Oct 2020. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Morrison & Associates Trustee Co 3 Limited (an entity) located at Huntington Park, Auckland postcode 2013,
Ivgen, Nigar (an individual) located at Castor Bay, Auckland postcode 0620. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2% of all shares (exactly 2 shares); it includes
Ivgen, Nigar (an individual) - located at Castor Bay, Auckland. "Restaurant operation" (ANZSIC H451130) is the classification the ABS issued to Devon Eatery Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/2 Te Pumanawa Square, Westgate, Auckland, 0814 | Registered & physical & service | 22 Oct 2020 |
418 Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 | Registered & service | 25 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigar Ivgen
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 12 May 2021 |
Director | 12 May 2021 - current |
Huseyin Isik
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 02 Nov 2015 |
Director | 02 Nov 2015 - 13 May 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Queens Parade, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 | Physical & registered | 24 Oct 2019 - 22 Oct 2020 |
418 Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 | Physical & registered | 02 Nov 2015 - 24 Oct 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison & Associates Trustee Co #3 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046323279 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Huntington Park Auckland 2013 |
12 Apr 2024 - current |
Ivgen, Nigar Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
22 Jan 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ivgen, Nigar Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
22 Jan 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison & Associates Trustee Co # 9 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048883788 Company Number: 8148959 Entity |
Huntington Park Auckland 2013 |
14 May 2021 - 12 Apr 2024 |
Isik, Huseyin Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
22 Jan 2018 - 14 May 2021 |
Nazar Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042033486 Company Number: 5828588 Entity |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
02 Nov 2015 - 22 Jan 2018 |
Nazar Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042033486 Company Number: 5828588 Entity |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
02 Nov 2015 - 22 Jan 2018 |
Isik, Huseyin Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
22 Jan 2018 - 14 May 2021 |
Isik, Huseyin Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
22 Jan 2018 - 14 May 2021 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Nazar Group Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 5828588 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
39 Point Chevalier Road Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
R & H Whitworth Limited 418 Titirangi Road |
|
Titirangi Festival Trust Level 2, Room 10, Lopdell House |
|
Titirangi Theatre Incorporated Lopdell House, |
|
J.s. Dental Limited 429 Titirangi Road |
|
Titirangi Community Arts Council Incorporated Lopdell House |
|
Subware Productions Limited 263c Titirangi Road |
Nkg Investments Limited 421a Titirangi Road |
Van Houten Ugolini Limited 14 Taraire Road |
Keena & Company Limited 23 Gilliam Street |
Greenwood Beijing Restaurant Limited 27 Parker Avenue |
Yongya Food Service Limited 38 Mason Street |
Kimaya Creations Limited 92 Seabrook Avenue |