Kingstons Project Management Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429042023081) was started on 29 Oct 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 (type: physical, service). Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, until 04 Mar 2021. 1998 shares are issued to 17 shareholders who belong to 9 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (5.01 per cent of shares), namely:
Chen, Su-Hsia (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Lin, Rene Wanyi (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5.01 per cent of all shares (100 shares); it includes
Jude Max Limited (an entity) - located at Avondale, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (67 shares, 3.35%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Lock Nominees Limited, located at Freemans Bay, Auckland (an entity),
Cooper, Anthony David, located at Glendowie, Auckland (a director). "Management services nec" (business classification M696297) is the classification the ABS issued Kingstons Project Management Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stuart Charles Mitchell
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - current |
Michael James Casey
Rd 1, Manurewa, 2576
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - current |
Christopher Robert Foote
Lincoln, Lincoln, 7608
Address used since 13 Feb 2018
Stonefields, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - current |
Anthony David Cooper
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 07 Aug 2017
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - current |
Grant James Wallace
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - current |
Benjamin Hague Tracy
Sandringham, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 12 Mar 2018 |
Director | 12 Mar 2018 - current |
Rene Wanyi Lin
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 16 May 2024 |
Director | 16 May 2024 - current |
Hamish Mcgregor Logan
Avondale, Auckland, 1026
Address used since 16 May 2024 |
Director | 16 May 2024 - current |
John David Moore
Dinsdale, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 29 Oct 2015 - 16 Nov 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 29 Oct 2015 - 04 Mar 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Su-hsia Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
16 May 2024 - current |
Lin, Rene Wanyi Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
16 May 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jude Max Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429052050305 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Avondale Auckland 1026 |
16 May 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lock Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036828951 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
09 Apr 2024 - current |
Cooper, Anthony David Director |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foote, Christopher Robert Director |
Lincoln Lincoln 7608 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Foote, Toni Ellen Individual |
Lincoln Lincoln 7608 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foote, Christopher Robert Director |
Lincoln Lincoln 7608 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Foote, Toni Ellen Individual |
Lincoln Lincoln 7608 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tracy Kitching Investment Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049200102 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
12 May 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wallace, Grant James Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Newman, Adam Peter Individual |
Rd 2 Drury 2578 |
27 May 2020 - current |
Wallace, Rosemary Kim Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mitchell Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030237544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Royal, Mark Anthony Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Casey, Jo-anne Amokura Individual |
Rd 1 Takanini 2576 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Casey, Michael James Director |
Rd 1 Takanini 2576 |
29 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foote, Patrick Desmond Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Moore, Noeline Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Foote, Patrick Desmond Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Foote, Patrick Desmond Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Foote, Patrick Desmond Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Foote, Patrick Desmond Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Fisher Lamberg Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036847761 Company Number: 1148270 Entity |
Newmarket Auckland 1149 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Fisher Lamberg Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036847761 Company Number: 1148270 Entity |
Newmarket Auckland 1149 |
29 Oct 2015 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Moore, Noeline Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Moore, Noeline Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Moore, John David Individual |
Dinsdale Hamilton 3204 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Wild, Craig Ralph Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
29 Oct 2015 - 28 Feb 2024 |
Tracy, Benjamin Hague Director |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 |
28 Aug 2018 - 12 May 2021 |
Wallace, Bruce Robert Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
29 Oct 2015 - 27 May 2020 |
Tracy, Benjamin Hague Director |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 |
28 Aug 2018 - 12 May 2021 |
Wallace, Bruce Robert Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
29 Oct 2015 - 27 May 2020 |
Atf Trustee (charlie) Limited Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street |
|
Atf Trustee (faray) Limited Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street |
|
Corrosion Control Engineering (nz) Limited Level 3, 16 College Hill |
|
West Terrace Limited Level 3, 16 College Hill |
|
Ihumatao Cleanfill Limited Level 3, 16 College Hill |
|
Atf Consultancy Limited Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street |
Somerton Consulting Limited Level 3, 16 College Hill |
Excalibur Homes Limited 58 College Hill Road |
Silver Moon Limited 1a Tahuna Street |
Guru Projects Limited 285 Ponsonby Road |
Little Climbers Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Circum Rothwell Limited 8 Murdoch Road |