Jcp Property Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041801109) was incorporated on 15 Jun 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Whale Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062 (type: physical, registered). 332A Ellerslie-Panmure Highway, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 25 Jan 2018. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 30 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Lansi, Maria Ella Charmaine (an individual) located at Mount Wellington, Auckland postcode 1062. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 35% of all shares (exactly 35 shares); it includes
Lansi, Perla Vergara (a director) - located at Mount Wellington, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (35 shares, 35%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lansi, Joseph Anthony, located at Mount Wellington, Auckland (a director). "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Jcp Property Limited. Our database was updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Whale Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062 | Physical & registered & service | 25 Jan 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Perla Vergara Lansi
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 14 May 2018
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 15 Jun 2015 |
Director | 15 Jun 2015 - current |
Joseph Anthony Lansi
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 14 May 2018
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 15 Jun 2015 |
Director | 15 Jun 2015 - current |
Maria Ella Charmaine Lansi
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 01 Jan 2021 |
Director | 01 Jan 2021 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
332a Ellerslie-panmure Highway, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical | 26 Jun 2015 - 25 Jan 2018 |
Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 15 Jun 2015 - 26 Jun 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lansi, Maria Ella Charmaine Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1062 |
10 Jan 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lansi, Perla Vergara Director |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1062 |
15 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lansi, Joseph Anthony Director |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1062 |
15 Jun 2015 - current |
Chhum Investments Limited 34 Panama Road |
|
D&n Limited 17 Mclennan Road |
|
Atlas Copco( N.z.) Limited 8 George Bourke Drive |
|
Forbo Siegling Limited 10 George Bourke Drive |
|
Jfk Jetskis & Rentals Limited 14c George Bourke Drive |
|
Emmanuel Agape Mission Trust 53 Hillside Road |
Chhum Investments Limited 34 Panama Road |
Capital K Limited 27 Hillside Road |
Joyti Sharma Investments Limited 48 Camp Road |
T.m.t Company Limited 35 Mataroa Road |
E Hazera Ltc Limited 23 Coppins Road |
Bi 4 U 2 Limited 45 Mataroa Road |