The Style Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041792681) was launched on 08 Jun 2015. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 7 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 (type: office, registered). 164B Bleakhouse Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Dec 2019. 100000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Jiang, Kun (a director) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014. "Clothing retailing" (ANZSIC G425115) is the classification the ABS issued The Style Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Office | unknown |
239 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 16 Nov 2016 |
236 Kepa Road, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 | Registered | 11 Dec 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kun Jiang
Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 08 Jun 2015 |
Director | 08 Jun 2015 - current |
Xuan Li
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 10 Jun 2015 |
Director | 08 Jun 2015 - 03 Dec 2019 |
7 Silverwood Drive , Flat Bush , Auckland , 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
164b Bleakhouse Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Registered | 16 Nov 2016 - 11 Dec 2019 |
97 Beechdale Crescent, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 | Physical & registered | 08 Jan 2016 - 16 Nov 2016 |
7 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Physical | 17 Jun 2015 - 08 Jan 2016 |
Suite G16, 239 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 08 Jun 2015 - 17 Jun 2015 |
7 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Registered | 08 Jun 2015 - 08 Jan 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jiang, Kun Director |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
08 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Xuan Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 |
08 Jun 2015 - 03 Dec 2019 |
Wang, Yiying Individual |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 |
28 May 2020 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Takeshi & Anongnuch Limited 16 Thyme Court |
|
Ql Construction Limited 12 Woodberry Drive |
|
Bevamadge Enterprises Limited 4 Thyme Court |
|
Jocoma Holdings Limited 4 Thyme Court |
|
Featherson Imports Limited 18 Silverwood Drive |
|
Namadi Investments Limited 18 Silverwood Drive |
Tanu Fashions Limited 60 Mission Heights Drive |
Wj NZ Limited 17 Kaitune Drive |
Wengwin Limited 3 Calcite Avenue |
Ccbs Limited 35 Middlefield Dr |
Nzone Race Management Limited Unit 5, 15 Accent Drive |
Gemdale Limited 33 Springside Drive |