Ktd Homes Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041782750) was started on 02 Jun 2015. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 560 Mount Eden Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: registered, service). 1 Rakino Way, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 11 Jan 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 45 shares (45% of shares), namely:
Clmt Company Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 55% of all shares (55 shares); it includes
Lud Holding Limited (an entity) - located at Whenuapai, Auckland. "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120) is the classification the ABS issued to Ktd Homes Limited. Our database was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Claude Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Jan 2022 |
560 Mount Eden Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & service | 13 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yingjia Zhuang
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 23 Jul 2021 |
Director | 02 Jun 2015 - current |
Tieniu Li
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 11 May 2022
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 10 Nov 2021
Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 02 Jun 2015 |
Director | 02 Jun 2015 - current |
Tieniu Li
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 10 Aug 2021 |
Director | 10 Aug 2021 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Can Zhang
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 02 Jun 2015 |
Director | 02 Jun 2015 - 25 Jun 2021 |
Hua Wu
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 02 Jun 2015 |
Director | 02 Jun 2015 - 04 Sep 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Rakino Way, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered | 02 Jun 2015 - 11 Jan 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clmt Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042484721 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
25 Jun 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lud Holding Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032546293 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whenuapai Auckland 0618 |
10 Nov 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wu, Danny Hua Individual |
Totara Vale Auckland 0627 |
25 Jun 2021 - 05 Oct 2022 |
Li, Tieniu Director |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland 0600 |
02 Jun 2015 - 23 Jul 2021 |
Li, Tieniu Director |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland 0600 |
02 Jun 2015 - 23 Jul 2021 |
Zhang, Can Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
02 Jun 2015 - 12 Aug 2019 |
Zhuang, Yingjia Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
23 Jul 2021 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Li, Tieniu Director |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland 0600 |
02 Jun 2015 - 23 Jul 2021 |
Wu, Hua Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
02 Jun 2015 - 04 Sep 2017 |
Can Zhang Director |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
02 Jun 2015 - 12 Aug 2019 |
Hua Wu Director |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
02 Jun 2015 - 04 Sep 2017 |
Lovens Building Supplies Limited 1 Rakino Way |
|
Gea Avapac Limited 8 Fisher Crescent |
|
Gea New Zealand Limited 8 Fisher Crescent |
|
Space Industries Limited 7 Fisher Crescent |
|
Tcl Hunt Limited 7 Fisher Crescent |
|
Meridian Aquatic Technology Australasia Limited 7 Fisher Crescent |
General Construction (2010) Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
Honfa Construction Limited Unit 2, 89 Waipuna Road |
Modus Construction Limited 15b Vestey Drive |
Green Homes New Zealand Limited Third Floor, 15b Vestey Drive |
Hongyoung Construction Limited 4 Convamore Lane |
Lifecare Construction (group) 2010 Limited Suite 4, 10a Aylesbury Street |