Magma Healthcare Limited (issued a business number of 9429041729090) was incorporated on 07 May 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 9 Belvedere Road, Carterton, Carterton, 5713 (type: physical, service). 444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton had been their registered address, up until 31 Jan 2019. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 499 shares (49.9 per cent of shares), namely:
K and S Investment Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Rd 1, Masterton postcode 5791. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Bivona, Dr David (a director) - located at Khandallah, Wellington. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Snook, Dr Simon, located at Rd 1, Carterton (a director). "Specialist medical practitioner nec" (business classification Q851280) is the category the ABS issued Magma Healthcare Limited. Our information was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9 Belvedere Road, Carterton, Carterton, 5713 | Physical & service & registered | 31 Jan 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dr Simon Snook
Rd 1, Carterton, 5791
Address used since 07 May 2015 |
Director | 07 May 2015 - current |
Dr David Bivona
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 07 May 2015 |
Director | 07 May 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2017 - 31 Jan 2019 |
81 Queen Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 | Physical & registered | 07 May 2015 - 10 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
K And S Investment Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051434274 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 1 Masterton 5791 |
20 Sep 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bivona, Dr David Director |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
07 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Snook, Dr Simon Director |
Rd 1 Carterton 5791 |
07 May 2015 - current |
Anasus Trustee Company Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Don Rob Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Knightrider Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Tula Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Craig John Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Penny Lane Home Trust Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
Jmk Healthcare Limited 161 Mangaroa Valley Road |
Exemed Limited 365 Ruahine Street |
Encorehealth Limited 24 Broadway Avenue |
Wairarapa Psychology Limited 598 Main Street |
Mana Orthopaedics Limited 107 Mana Esplanade |
Griffiths Gastroenterology Limited 205 Barnard Street |