Champion Building Solutions Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041697177) was registered on 04 May 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 168 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 (type: registered, physical). 168 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up to 12 Apr 2016. Champion Building Solutions Limited used other names, namely: M E Limited from 29 Oct 2015 to 22 Jan 2019, Mobility Essentials Limited (11 Sep 2015 to 29 Oct 2015) and Mobility Warehouse Limited (08 Apr 2015 - 11 Sep 2015). 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Champion Investments Limited (an entity) located at Palmerston North postcode 4414. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Dickins, Bridget (an individual) - located at Palmerston North. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Champion, Heath James, located at Palmerston North (a director). "Investment company operation" (business classification K624050) is the category the ABS issued Champion Building Solutions Limited. Our database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
168 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Apr 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Heath James Champion
Palmerston North, 4775
Address used since 12 Sep 2022
Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 01 Jan 2019
Milson, Palmerston North, 4414
Address used since 01 Jan 2019 |
Director | 01 Jan 2019 - current |
Brent Thomas Dickins
Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 12 Apr 2017 |
Director | 02 Oct 2015 - 23 Jan 2019 |
Sheridan Vining
Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4440
Address used since 04 May 2015 |
Director | 04 May 2015 - 08 Oct 2015 |
Callum Warren Vining
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 04 May 2015 |
Director | 04 May 2015 - 02 Oct 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
168 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 | Physical & registered | 04 May 2015 - 12 Apr 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Champion Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049363920 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Palmerston North 4414 |
01 Sep 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dickins, Bridget Individual |
Palmerston North 4775 |
01 Sep 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Champion, Heath James Director |
Palmerston North 4775 |
23 Jan 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wattle Gold Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037088477 Company Number: 1099163 Entity |
Palmerston North 4410 |
29 Oct 2015 - 23 Jan 2019 |
Vining Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030421523 Company Number: 4139879 Entity |
04 May 2015 - 29 Oct 2015 | |
Vining Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030421523 Company Number: 4139879 Entity |
04 May 2015 - 29 Oct 2015 | |
Wattle Gold Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037088477 Company Number: 1099163 Entity |
Palmerston North 4410 |
29 Oct 2015 - 23 Jan 2019 |
Peter Day Trustees Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
|
Bala Properties Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
|
Hill Trustee Company Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
|
The Lychway Funeral Directors Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
|
Vining Group Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
|
Purely Cremations And Simple Burials Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
Tesla Trustee Limited 168 Broadway Avenue |
Kuhm Healthcare Limited 170 Broadway Avenue |
Shareena Sandbrook Limited 36 Victoria Avenue |
Forest Hill Trading Limited 633 Main Street |
Wild At Heart (2005) Limited 16 Milverton Avenue |
Feliciano Holdings Limited 268 Broadway Avenue |