Ayrdene Farms Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041639368) was started on 11 Mar 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 31 Aug 2022. 1000000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 450000 shares (45 per cent of shares), namely:
Paterson, Murray Alexander (a director) located at Rd 3, Lawrence postcode 9593. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 45 per cent of all shares (450000 shares); it includes
Paterson, Willis (a director) - located at Rd 3, Lawrence. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (50000 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Howie, Warwick James, located at Rd 3, Lawrence (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray Alexander Paterson
Rd 3, Lawrence, 9593
Address used since 11 Mar 2015 |
Director | 11 Mar 2015 - current |
Willis Paterson
Rd 3, Lawrence, 9593
Address used since 11 Mar 2015 |
Director | 11 Mar 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 08 Nov 2018 - 31 Aug 2022 |
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 11 Mar 2015 - 08 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paterson, Murray Alexander Director |
Rd 3 Lawrence 9593 |
11 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paterson, Willis Director |
Rd 3 Lawrence 9593 |
11 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Howie, Warwick James Individual |
Rd 3 Lawrence 9593 |
11 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Howie, Jane Rosa Individual |
Rd 3 Lawrence 9593 |
11 Mar 2015 - current |
Teresa Chan Law Trustee 2014 Limited Westpac Building Level 3, |
|
Trueform Products Limited Level 4 Westpac Building |
|
The Bendigo Valley Sports And Charity Foundation 6 Westpac Trust Building |
|
The Old Karitane Store Limited Westpac Building, 106 George Street |
|
Southern Critical Care Trust Pwc |
|
Drti Holdings Limited 10 George Street |