Rst Rentals Limited (issued a business number of 9429041540602) was started on 12 Dec 2014. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5781 (type: physical, service). 3 Grey Street, Martinborough had been their physical address, up to 17 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Channer, Jeffrey David (a director) located at Martinborough, Martinborough postcode 5781. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the category the ABS issued to Rst Rentals Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5781 | Postal & delivery | 05 May 2020 |
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5871 | Office | 05 May 2020 |
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5781 | Registered | 15 May 2020 |
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5781 | Physical & service | 17 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brenda Joan Channer
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5781
Address used since 05 May 2020
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711
Address used since 12 Dec 2014 |
Director | 12 Dec 2014 - current |
Jeffrey David Channer
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5781
Address used since 05 May 2020
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711
Address used since 12 Dec 2014 |
Director | 12 Dec 2014 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, 5781 | Physical & service | 17 Jun 2020 |
31 Romina Way , Martinborough , 5871 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Grey Street, Martinborough, 5711 | Physical | 15 May 2020 - 17 Jun 2020 |
31 Romina Way, Martinborough, Martinborough, 5781 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2020 - 15 May 2020 |
3 Grey Street, Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 | Physical & registered | 11 May 2016 - 13 May 2020 |
29 Jellicoe Street, Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 | Physical & registered | 12 Dec 2014 - 11 May 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Channer, Jeffrey David Director |
Martinborough Martinborough 5781 |
12 Dec 2014 - current |
Eat Scenery Aotearoa Limited 1 Grey Street |
|
Primal Genius Limited 1 Grey Street |
|
Caldak Limited 9 Roberts Street |
|
Kitchener Vineyard Limited 8 Venice Street |
|
Granite Assurance Limited 8 Venice Street |
|
Pirinoa Vineyard Limited 8 Venice Street |
Dominion Park Investments Limited 51 Regent Street |
Avantgord Limited 142 Todds Road |
Agile Property Services Limited 284c Dry River Road |
Apollo Landings Limited 184b Glenmorven Road |
Gary And Boo Limited 19 Boundary Road |
Istari Investments Limited 54 Jellicoe Street |