Mj Noonan Trustees Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041491935) was incorporated on 13 Nov 2014. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 11B Ashgrove Terrace, Somerfield, Christchurch, 8024 (type: registered, physical). 47 Longhurst Terrace, Cashmere, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 15 Jun 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Noonan, Matthew James (a director) located at Cashmere, Christchurch postcode 8022. Our data was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
148 Dyers Pass Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 | Delivery & postal & office | 05 Jun 2020 |
11b Ashgrove Terrace, Somerfield, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Jun 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Balfour Evans
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 05 Jun 2018
Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 13 Nov 2014 |
Director | 13 Nov 2014 - current |
Matthew James Noonan
Somerfield, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 27 Jun 2023
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 01 Nov 2021
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 05 Jun 2020
Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023
Address used since 16 Jun 2016
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 05 Jun 2018 |
Director | 13 Nov 2014 - current |
148 Dyers Pass Road , Cashmere , Christchurch , 8022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
47 Longhurst Terrace, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 | Registered & physical | 15 Nov 2021 - 15 Jun 2022 |
148 Dyers Pass Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 | Registered & physical | 15 Jun 2020 - 15 Nov 2021 |
88a Dyers Pass Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 | Registered & physical | 14 Jun 2018 - 15 Jun 2020 |
123 Strickland Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2017 - 14 Jun 2018 |
31 Muir Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 | Physical & registered | 13 Nov 2014 - 15 Jun 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Noonan, Matthew James Director |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
13 Nov 2014 - current |
Man In A Van Limited 37 Browning Street |
|
Canterbury Community Gardens Association Incorporated 188 Strickland Street |
|
Inter School Chess Charitable Trust Board 149 Strickland Street |
|
Electric Alley Limited 156 Milton Street |
|
Architecta Limited 4 Scott Street |
|
Jmi Construction & Renovation Limited 127 Roker Street |