Vertech Nz Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041408599) was started on 01 Oct 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 4, 152 Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 (type: physical, service). 152 Devonport Road, Tauranga, Tauranga had been their physical address, until 09 Jul 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Vertech Group Pty Ltd (an other) located at West Leederville/Western Australia postcode 6007. "Oil and gas field services" (ANZSIC B109010) is the category the ABS issued to Vertech Nz Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 29 May 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 152 Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & service & registered | 09 Jul 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Esteban Cesan
Katy, Texas, 77449
Address used since 14 Jun 2018 |
Director | 14 Jun 2018 - current |
Alessandro Cesan
Darch, Perth, Western Australia, 6065
Address used since 14 Jun 2018
West Leederville, Western Australia, 6007
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 14 Jun 2018 - current |
Raul Cesan
Palm Beach, Florida, FL3340
Address used since 14 Jun 2018 |
Director | 14 Jun 2018 - current |
Thomas Daniel Brennan
West Leederville, Perth, 6007
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
24 Nautilus Crescent, Scarborough, Western Australia, 6019
Address used since 14 Jun 2018 |
Director | 14 Jun 2018 - current |
Benjamin Charlton
Bacchus Marsh/victoria, 3340
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Trigg/western Australia, 6020
Address used since 26 Oct 2015
Bacchus Marsh/victoria, 3340
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 26 Oct 2015 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Iain M. | Director | 01 Oct 2014 - 14 Jun 2018 |
Roderick M. | Director | 01 Oct 2014 - 14 Jun 2018 |
Kevin Robertson White
Park Island, Dubai Marina, Dubai/uae,
Address used since 10 Nov 2016 |
Director | 26 Oct 2015 - 19 Mar 2017 |
Denis Rheal Belliveau
Ocean Reef/wa, 6027
Address used since 01 Oct 2014 |
Director | 01 Oct 2014 - 24 Feb 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
152 Devonport Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 15 Nov 2017 - 09 Jul 2018 |
152 Devonport Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 01 Oct 2014 - 15 Nov 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vertech Group Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
West Leederville/western Australia 6007 |
24 Dec 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brennan, Thomas Daniel Individual |
Scarborough, Wa 6019 |
01 Oct 2014 - 08 Dec 2015 |
Global Energy Group Asia Pacific Pty Ltd Company Number: 153269955 Other |
01 Oct 2014 - 24 Dec 2015 | |
Charlton, Benjamin Individual |
Trigg, Wa 6020 |
01 Oct 2014 - 08 Dec 2015 |
Jarvis, Andrew Robert Individual |
Mosman Park/wa 6012 |
01 Oct 2014 - 14 May 2015 |
Denis Rheal Belliveau Director |
Ocean Reef/wa 6027 |
01 Oct 2014 - 14 May 2015 |
Global Energy Group Asia Pacific Pty Ltd Company Number: 153269955 Other |
01 Oct 2014 - 24 Dec 2015 | |
Belliveau, Denis Rheal Individual |
Ocean Reef/wa 6027 |
01 Oct 2014 - 14 May 2015 |
Effective Date | 15 Sep 2018 |
Name | Commercial Worldwide Asia Pacific Pty Ltd |
Type | Private Limited Company |
Country of origin | AU |
Opnz Limited 299 Cameron Road |
Pdh Energy Services Limited 1247 Ranolf Street |
Weka Well Services Limited 21 Walmsley Rd, St Heliers |
Kevin & Rose Christian Limited 10 Maheke Street |
For The Tumeke-thru-tubing, Limited 83 Albert Street |
Marubeni-itochu Tubulars Oceania Pty Ltd 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |