Flava Interiors Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041406526) was started on 12 Sep 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 67 Golders Road,, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 6011 (type: registered, physical). Level 4, Berl House, 108 The Terrace, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 15 Jul 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Horne, Terrance Sharn (a director) located at Totara Park, Upper Hutt postcode 5018,
Menzies, Shannon (a director) located at Elderslea, Upper Hutt postcode 5018. "Building, house construction" (business classification E301120) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Flava Interiors Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
67 Golders Road,, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shannon Menzies
Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 01 Feb 2015 |
Director | 12 Sep 2014 - current |
Terrance Sharn Horne
Totara Park, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 03 Oct 2016 |
Director | 12 Sep 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, Berl House, 108 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 11 Oct 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
46 Boulcott Street, Boulcott, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 07 Nov 2017 - 11 Oct 2019 |
46 Boulcott Street, Boulcott, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical | 17 Oct 2016 - 11 Oct 2019 |
67 Golders Road, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered | 22 Jun 2016 - 07 Nov 2017 |
67 Golders Road, Elderslea, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Physical | 22 Jun 2016 - 17 Oct 2016 |
28 Omaha Grove, Totara Park, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & physical | 12 Sep 2014 - 22 Jun 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horne, Terrance Sharn Director |
Totara Park Upper Hutt 5018 |
12 Sep 2014 - current |
Menzies, Shannon Director |
Elderslea Upper Hutt 5018 |
12 Sep 2014 - current |
Candy Properties Limited 79 Pasadena Crescent |
|
Combined Horse Clubs Of Upper Hutt Society Incorporated C/o The President Rosanne English |
|
Wal Gordon Plumbing Limited 6 Tacoma Drive |
|
Plumbers Gasfitters And Drainlayers Federation Of New Zealand Incorporated 6 Tacoma Drive, |
|
Foresee Communications Limited 31 Pasadena Crescent |
|
Tira Company Limited 3 Camden Rd |
Peter Peryer Builders Limited 12 Morepork Close |
Peter Peryer Limited 12 Morepork Close |
Hutt Valley Building Contractors Limited 80 Clouston Park Road |
Snowden Bricks And Blocks Limited 17 Cruickshank Road |
Pad Mac Construction Limited 14 Mccarthy Grove |
Chocolate Chippie Construction Limited 21 Montgomery Crescent |