Ktsm Properties Limited (issued a business number of 9429041391686) was incorporated on 02 Sep 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 16, Oakleigh Avenue, Auckland, 2112 (type: physical, registered). 84 College Road, Northcote, Auckland had been their registered address, until 18 May 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Tan, Zhi Kai (a director) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Ktsm Properties Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16, Oakleigh Avenue, Auckland, 2112 | Physical & registered & service | 18 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhi Kai Tan
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 01 Mar 2020
Takanini, Takanini, 2112
Address used since 31 Mar 2018
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 26 Sep 2016
Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 14 Apr 2019 |
Director | 02 Sep 2014 - current |
13 Linley Place , Hillcrest , Auckland , 0627 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
84 College Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Registered & physical | 30 Apr 2020 - 18 May 2021 |
13 Linley Place, Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & registered | 24 Apr 2019 - 30 Apr 2020 |
Unit 804, 188 Hobson Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 14 Jul 2017 - 24 Apr 2019 |
17 Wakefield Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 04 Oct 2016 - 14 Jul 2017 |
188 Hobson Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 04 Nov 2014 - 04 Oct 2016 |
16 Oakleigh Avenue, Takanini, Takanini, 2112 | Physical & registered | 02 Sep 2014 - 04 Nov 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tan, Zhi Kai Director |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
02 Sep 2014 - current |
Quadrant Management Services Limited 188 Hobson Street |
|
188 Hobson Apartments Limited 188 Hobson Street |
|
Maxtech Limited Apt 2 H47 Apartments |
|
Trans Pacific Talent Enterprises Limited Level 4, 4 Graham Street |
|
Burnes Mcdonald Trustee Limited 126 Vincent Street, Level 10 |
|
Teague Burnes Trustee Limited 126 Vincent Street, Level 10 |
Hung Mau Limited Ground Floor |
Calm Trustee Company Limited Level 8 |
Monkey Hill Property Holdings Limited Level 8 |
Laurentian Holdings Limited 139 Vincent Street |
W Brick & Company Limited 139 Vincent Street |
Lagoonia Limited 139 Vincent Street |